Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2021 at 16:15:08 (UTC).

ILUMINADA AQUINO VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 ILUMINADA AQUINO filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH and ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4823

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AQUINO ILUMINADA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

DAVITA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA DBA DAVITA KIDNEY DIALYSIS CENTER

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

ROBERT AND RAFAEL MENDEZ WILSHIRE B1 PARTNERSHIP AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

VERO CONDOMINIUM OWNERS' ASSOCIATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MENDEZ ROBERT

MENDEZ RAFAEL

ROBERT MENDEZ & RAFAEL MENDEZ 1893 WILSHIRE BOULEVARD PARTNERSHIP A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

WILSHIRE B1 PARTNERSHIP AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

ROBERT MENDEZ & RAFAEL MENDEZ 1893 WILSHIRE PARTNERSHIP ESA ROBERT MENDEZ; RAFAEL MENDEZ; WILSHIRE B1 PARTNERSHIP; 1893 WILSHIRE BLVD. PARTNERSHIP

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

VERO CONDOMINIUM OWNERS' ASSOCIATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ESPINA CLAIRE NAVARRO

Attorney at Espina Lawyers, APLC

18757 Burbank Blvd Ste 215

Tarzana, CA 91356

ESPINA CLAIRE N. ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ELDER BRAD

MATHEVOSIAN RINA M

DAY TIMOTHY QUINN

SLAVIN HOWARD ALLAN

PATEL VIJAY J.

DAY TIMOTHY Q. DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEY

PATEL VIJAY J. ESQ.

O'DAY DALLAS J. ESQ.

ELDER BRAD M. ESQ.

HALL ANN C. ESQ.

MATHEVOSIAN RINA M. ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

O'DAY DALLAS J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

6/3/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Case Management Statement

9/11/2020: Case Management Statement

Answer

5/1/2020: Answer

Request for Dismissal

3/6/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

3/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING AND ORDERS RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

3/6/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING AND ORDERS RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Mail

2/21/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

3/2/2020: Case Management Statement

Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/13/2020: Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

11/26/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF CLAIRE N. ESPINA IN SUPPORT

11/8/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF CLAIRE N. ESPINA IN SUPPORT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/1/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/16/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA

3/26/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA

Proof of Personal Service

3/4/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/1/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

2/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/13/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • Hearing04/27/2022 at 11:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • Hearing04/15/2022 at 11:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates); Filed by Robert Mended & Rafael Mendez 1893 Wilshire Partnership Erroneously Sued As Robert Mendez & Rafael Mendez 1893 Wilshire Boulevard Partnership, a California General Partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Davita Inc., a Delaware Corporation authorized to do business in California dba Davita Kidney Dialysis Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (of Vero Condominium Owners' Association's Cross-Complaint) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (of Summons and Complaint) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Robert Mended & Rafael Mendez 1893 Wilshire Partnership Erroneously Sued As Robert Mendez & Rafael Mendez 1893 Wilshire Boulevard Partnership, a California General Partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (of Summons and Complaint) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Iluminada Aquino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Iluminada Aquino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Iluminada Aquino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by Iluminada Aquino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketStanding Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Iluminada Aquino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Iluminada Aquino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Iluminada Aquino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERO CONDOMINIUM OWNER'S ASSOCIATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DAVITA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ESPINA CLAIRE NAVARRO