This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2020 at 09:14:34 (UTC).

ILIUD PORTILLO, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS CITY OF BURBANK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 ILIUD PORTILLO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF BURBANK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL M. CROWLEY and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4775

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PORTILLO AN INDIVIDUAL ILIUD

ORTIZ AN INDIVIDUAL APRIL

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CITY OF BURBANK

CALIFORNIA STATE TRANSPORTATION AGENCY

CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

SECURITY PAVING COMPANY INC.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CALIFORNIA STATE TRANSPORTATION AGENCY

CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

SECURITY PAVING COMPANY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALDER MICHAEL ESQ.

MANGOLI SHAWN ESQ.

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LEE MICHAEL MINSHEN

ENGELIEN KEVIN JOHN

AUSTIN DAVID ALLEN

ROBERT HUSTON W.

OVSEPYAN IVETA

HUSTON ROBERT W.

HUSTON ROBERT WATSON

O'NEILL ELIZABETH MARY

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

ROBERT HUSTON W.

OVSEPYAN IVETA

HUSTON ROBERT WATSON

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

7/23/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF JUDGES RECUSAL AND CASE TRANSFER

6/22/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF JUDGES RECUSAL AND CASE TRANSFER

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL CITY OF BURBANK'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION

5/4/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL CITY OF BURBANK'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRONSON W. SMITH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION

5/4/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRONSON W. SMITH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL M. LEE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION

5/4/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL M. LEE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION

Notice - NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE RE DEFENDANT CHP'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) OF PLAINTIFF APRIL ORTIZ AND REQUEST FOR M

4/13/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE RE DEFENDANT CHP'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) OF PLAINTIFF APRIL ORTIZ AND REQUEST FOR M

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDERED CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/17/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDERED CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

3/13/2020: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

2/3/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

2/3/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/24/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Substitution of Attorney

10/23/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Answer

10/15/2019: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

9/30/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/30/2019: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • Hearing05/03/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Hearing04/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4A; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production filed by defendant City of Burbank) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production filed by defendant Security Paving) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Admissions (filed by defendant Security Paving) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by City of Burbank (Defendant); California Department Of Transportation (Defendant); Security Paving Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Iliud Portillo, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Iliud Portillo, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Iliud Portillo, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Iliud Portillo, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Iliud Portillo, an individual (Plaintiff); April Ortiz, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Iliud Portillo, an individual (Plaintiff); April Ortiz, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Iliud Portillo, an individual (Plaintiff); April Ortiz, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCV24775    Hearing Date: March 03, 2020    Dept: 28

Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Michael Alder, Mary Caruso, and Shawn Mangoli (“Counsel”), counsel for plaintiffs Iliud Portillo and April Ortiz move to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff Ortiz. 

The court has discretion to allow an attorney to withdraw, and such a motion should be granted provided that there is no prejudice to the client and it does not disrupt the orderly process of justice. (Ramirez v. Sturdevant (1994) 21 Cal.App.4th 904, 915; People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal.App.2d 398.)

CRC Rule 3.1362 (Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel) requires:

  1. notice of motion and motion to be directed to the client (made on the Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-051)); 

  1. a declaration stating in general terms and without compromising the confidentiality of the attorney-client relationship why a motion under Code of Civil Procedure section 284(2) is brought instead of ling a consent under Code of Civil Procedure section 284(1) (made on the Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil form (MC-052)); 

  1. service of the notice of motion and motion and declaration on all other parties who have appeared in the case; and 

  1. the proposed order relieving counsel (prepared on the Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil form (MC-053)).

Counsel has filed forms MC-051, MC-052, and MC-053 pursuant to CRC Rule 3.1362 for Plaintiff.

Counsel declares that the motion was served upon Plaintiff at his last known address. (MC-052 § 3.a.) However, Counsel has been unable to confirm that the address is current after mailing the motion papers to the client’s last known address, calling the client’s last known phone number, and conducting a Westlaw People Map Search. The Court finds such efforts to be reasonable under CRC 3.1362(d)(1)(A). 

Counsel declares that Plaintiff Ortiz has been non-responsive to communication and will not assist with discovery efforts. 

A non-jury trial is set for January 11, 2021. The next hearing in this matter is a March 27, 2020, hearing on Plaintiffs’ Motion for Leave to file a First Amended Complaint. Although this motion is unopposed, the Court considers the issue of prejudice, and finds no prejudice in allowing Counsel to be relieved at this time. 

Based on the foregoing, Michael Alder, Mary Caruso, and Shawn Mangoli’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff April Ortiz is GRANTED.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECURITY PAVING COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF BURBANK PARAMEDIC SERVICES is a litigant