This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2022 at 07:39:39 (UTC).

ILANA JIVAGO VS EQUINOX FITNESS ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/02/2018 ILANA JIVAGO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EQUINOX FITNESS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH, FREDERICK C. SHALLER and MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6227

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

FREDERICK C. SHALLER

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

JIVAGO ILANA

Respondents and Defendants

EQUINOX FITNESS

SANTA MONICA INC

DOES 1 TO 50

EQUINOX FITNESS SANTA MONICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PERRI KENNETH SCOTT ESQ.

PERRI KENNETH SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBMISSION OF STIPULATION REOPENING D...)

12/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBMISSION OF STIPULATION REOPENING D...)

Order - ORDER ORDER [PROPOSED] RE: COMPLETION DISCOVERY

12/16/2021: Order - ORDER ORDER [PROPOSED] RE: COMPLETION DISCOVERY

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

12/17/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

12/17/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBMISSION OF STIPULATION REOPENING D...)

12/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBMISSION OF STIPULATION REOPENING D...)

Other - - BRIEF FILING COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF'S OVERVIEW OF OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY MATTERS WITH OBJECTIONS

12/8/2021: Other - - BRIEF FILING COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF'S OVERVIEW OF OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY MATTERS WITH OBJECTIONS

Memorandum - MEMORANDUM MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING COMPLETION OF DISCOVERY

12/10/2021: Memorandum - MEMORANDUM MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING COMPLETION OF DISCOVERY

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/10/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Ruling

11/12/2021: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service by Mail

11/12/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Ruling

12/2/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: COMPLETION OF MSC)

10/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: COMPLETION OF MSC)

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING

9/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/15/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: COMPLETION OF MSC)

9/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: COMPLETION OF MSC)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE

4/22/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/22/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • Hearing02/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Hearing02/14/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Hearing01/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketOrder (ORDER [PROPOSED] RE: COMPLETION DISCOVERY); Filed by Equinox Fitness, Santa Monica, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Order to Show Cause Re: (Submission of Stipulation Reopening Discovery For A Limited Purpose) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Submission of Stipulation Reopening D...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Equinox Fitness, Santa Monica, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketMemorandum (MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING COMPLETION OF DISCOVERY); Filed by Equinox Fitness, Santa Monica, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Ilana Jivago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketSeparate Statement (of Issues Regarding Motion to Quash or Limit Deposition Subpoena); Filed by Ilana Jivago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (of Ilana Jivago in Support of Motion to Quash [or Limit] Deposition Subpoena for Consumer/Employment Records); Filed by Ilana Jivago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Ilana Jivago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Equinox Fitness, Santa Monica, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Ilana Jivago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ilana Jivago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC696227    Hearing Date: July 20, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

ilana jivago,

Plaintiff,

v.

vons grocery store,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC696227

Hearing Date: July 20, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

Plaintiff’s motion to re-open discovery

NOTICE

The Court posts this tentative order on July 16, 2020. Any party who does not appear at the hearing shall submit to this tentative, including the new trial date. The Court authorizes the parties to appear remotely.

TENTATIVE ORDER

Plaintiff Ilana Jivago (“Plaintiff”) moves to re-open discovery in this matter. In determining whether to re-open discovery, the court must consider the necessity of and reasons for the additional discovery, the diligence or lack thereof by the party seeking to reopen discovery in attempting to complete discovery prior to the cutoff, whether permitting the discovery will prevent the case from going forward on the trial date or will otherwise prejudice any party, and any past continuances of the trial date. (See Code Civ. Proc., § 2024.050, subd. (b).)

Plaintiff filed this motion on March 17, 2020, stating in her declaration that she was in Israel as a result of her father’s illness and eventual passing, as well as her sister’s treatment for cancer. On May 20, 2020, the Court issued an order stating that it cannot determine whether there is good cause to reopen discovery because Plaintiff does not state what discovery she intends to seek from Defendant or explain why she could not have obtained the discovery before the cut-off. The Court ordered Plaintiff to file a supplemental declaration addressing these issues.

In her supplemental declaration, Plaintiff identifies the following discovery:

1. An instruction manual, if one exists, that Defendant provided to its employees concerning their conduct. (Plaintiff’s Supplemental Declaration, ¶ 25.)

2. Depositions of Defendant’s employees. (Id., ¶ 40.)

3. An inspection of the shower at issue. (Id., ¶ 42.)

The Court finds good cause to reopen discovery on these issues.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

The Court grants Plaintiff’s motion to reopen discovery only in order for Plaintiff to pursue the following discovery: (1) An instruction manual, if one exists, that Defendant provided to its employees concerning their conduct; (2) Depositions of Defendant’s Person Most Qualified, as well as any of Defendant’s employees who were working on the date of the incident; and (3) An inspection of the shower at issue. Discovery shall remain closed in all other respects.

The Court also provides notice that it intends to continue the trial in this matter based upon the Presiding Judge’s order of July 10, 2020, ordering that no civil jury trial shall commence before January 2021. Therefore, the Court advances and vacates the final status conference and trial dates and sets the following dates:

Final Status Conference: April 15, 2021, at 10:00 a.m.

Trial: April 30, 2021, at 8:30 a.m.

The discovery and motions cut-off dates for the above-referenced discovery, as well as any related motions, shall be based on the new trial date. The Court also authorizes Defendant to file a motion for summary judgment based on the new trial date. However, all other discovery and motions shall remain closed. The Court’s clerk shall provide notice.

DATED: July 20, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANTA MONICA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where EQUINOX FITNESS SOUTH BAY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where EQUINOX FITNESS SANTA MONICA INC. ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS EQUINOX AND/OR THE RELATED COMPANIES L.P is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERRI KENNETH S.