This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:33:40 (UTC).

ILANA BLOCH VS MUSEUM ASSOCIATES

Case Summary

On 12/21/2017 ILANA BLOCH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MUSEUM ASSOCIATES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7077

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Defendants

BLOCH ILANA

PARKING CONCEPTS INC.

ALLIED UNIVERSITY SECURITY SERVICES

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

CALIFORNIA STATE OF

MUSEUM ASSOCIATES

ALLIED UNIVERSAL TOPCO

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

LOS ANGELES COUNTY MUSEUM OF ART

PARKING CONCEPTS INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

ALLIEDBARTON SECURITY SERVICES LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

STEINER JON M. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

VASQUEZ OLIVER J. ESQ.

STANLEY JAMES G.ESQ.

OLSON SONALI

VASQUEZ OLIVER JOHN ESQ.

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BASILE CARL J

LENKOV JEFFREY

STANLEY JAMES G. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Motion for Summary Judgment

7/31/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Association of Attorney

12/27/2018: Association of Attorney

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/7/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Answer

2/20/2019: Answer

Cross-Complaint

2/20/2019: Cross-Complaint

Summons

2/20/2019: Summons

Substitution of Attorney

3/13/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Request for Dismissal

5/8/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/8/2019: Request for Dismissal

Order

5/8/2019: Order

Ex Parte Application

5/9/2019: Ex Parte Application

CIVIL DEPOSIT

2/22/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR EXPRESS INDEMNITY; EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; CONTRIBUTION; BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

2/22/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR EXPRESS INDEMNITY; EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; CONTRIBUTION; BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR EXPRESS INDEMNITY; EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; CONTRIBUTION; BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

6/8/2018: FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR EXPRESS INDEMNITY; EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; CONTRIBUTION; BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

Summons on Cross Complaint

7/30/2018: Summons on Cross Complaint

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDELING ATTORNEY

8/27/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDELING ATTORNEY

SUMMONS

12/21/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

12/21/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Hearingat 13:30 PM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by allied Universal Topco (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketBrief (Compendium of Evidence In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, Summary Adjudication); Filed by allied Universal Topco (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Filed by allied Universal Topco (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to continue trial) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT FOR EXPRESS INDEMNITY; EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; CONTRIBUTION; BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Museum Associates (Defendant); Los Angeles, County of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Museum Associates (Defendant); Los Angeles County Museum of Art (Defendant); Los Angeles, County of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint (for Express Indemnity; Equitable Indemnity; Contribution; Breach of Implied Warranty and Declaratory Relief); Filed by Museum Associates (Cross-Complainant); Los Angeles, County of (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Museum Associates (Defendant); Los Angeles County Museum of Art (Defendant); Los Angeles, County of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANTS, MUSEUM ASSOCIATES DBA LOS ANGELES COUNTY MUSEUM OF ART AND COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ilana Bloch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC687077    Hearing Date: November 15, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ILANA BLOCH,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

MUSEUM ASSOCIATES, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC687077

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 15, 2019

Plaintiff, Ilana Bloch filed this action against Defendants, Museum Associates, Los Angeles County Museum of Art, County of Los Angeles, Allied Universal Topco, Parking Concepts, Inc., City of Los Angeles, and State of California for damages arising out of a trip and fall. Plaintiff added Moving Defendant, Allied Barton Security Services, LP as a doe defendant to the action.

At this time Defendant, Allied Barton has agreed to settle all claims with Plaintiff for $10,000. Defendant seeks an order from the Court finding that the settlement is in good faith.

Defendant timely and properly served the moving papers on all other parties to the action. On 10/18/19, Co-Defendants, LACMTA and Parking Concepts filed opposition to the motion. No other party has filed opposition to the motion. On 10/13/19, the Court’s research attorney reached out to Allied Barton’s attorney to inquire whether any reply documents had been filed. Counsel responded and indicated LACMTA/Parking Concepts had agreed to withdraw their opposition to the motion by the end of the day on 10/13/19. The Court does not, at this time, have any formal notice of withdrawal. The Court is relying on Allied Barton’s attorney’s representation in rendering this ruling; if LACMTA/Parking Concepts appear at the hearing and indicate the opposition is NOT withdrawn, the Court will continue the hearing on the matter to consider the opposition substantively.

The burden on a motion for determination of good faith settlement rests squarely on the party opposing the finding of good faith. CCP §877.6(d). In light of the lack of opposition/withdrawn opposition, no party has met that burden. The motion for determination of good faith settlement is therefore granted.

Moving Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.