This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 13:24:35 (UTC).

IH6 PROPERTY WEST, L.P., A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS ROBERTO RAMIREZ ESPINOZA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 IH6 PROPERTY WEST, L P , A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed an Other lawsuit against ROBERTO RAMIREZ ESPINOZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1364

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IH6 PROPERTY WEST L.P. A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

DIAZ BRIGITTE

ESPINOZA ROBERTO RAMIREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS CHRIS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/6/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

10/6/2021: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

10/7/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (BRIGITTE DIAZ)

10/7/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (BRIGITTE DIAZ)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ROBERTO RAMIREZ ESPINOZA)

10/7/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ROBERTO RAMIREZ ESPINOZA)

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/16/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/16/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/16/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • Hearing03/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by IH6 Property West, L.P., a Delaware Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by IH6 Property West, L.P., a Delaware Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by IH6 Property West, L.P., a Delaware Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Roberto Ramirez Espinoza)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Brigitte Diaz)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by IH6 Property West, L.P., a Delaware Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by IH6 Property West, L.P., a Delaware Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by IH6 Property West, L.P., a Delaware Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by IH6 Property West, L.P., a Delaware Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IH6 Property West, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVANS CHRIS