This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2022 at 13:05:47 (UTC).

IGNACIO DUENAS VS BELCAN ENGINEERING GROUP, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/24/2022 IGNACIO DUENAS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BELCAN ENGINEERING GROUP, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4198

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUENAS IGNACIO

Defendants

BELCAN ENGINEERING GROUP LLC

PPG INDUSTRIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GENISH JONATHAN M

DUVAN-CLARKE BARBARA

SPELLMAN ALEXANDER K

Defendant Attorney

BRODY JENNIFER A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/24/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/24/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/24/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10/24/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

10/24/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

10/24/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Personal Service

10/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

11/17/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

11/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

Initial Status Conference Order

11/17/2022: Initial Status Conference Order

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: COMPLEX CASE DETERMINATION & INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

11/23/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: COMPLEX CASE DETERMINATION & INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DEFENDANT BELCAN ENGERINEERING GROUP LLC

11/29/2022: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DEFENDANT BELCAN ENGERINEERING GROUP LLC

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2023
  • Hearing02/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance Defendant Belcan Engerineering Group LLC; Filed by: Belcan Engineering Group, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order Re: Complex Case Determination & Initial Status Conference; Filed by: Ignacio Duenas (Plaintiff); As to: Belcan Engineering Group, LLC (Defendant); PPG Industries, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 02/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Yvette M. Palazuelos in Department 9 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ignacio Duenas (Plaintiff); As to: Belcan Engineering Group, LLC (Defendant); PPG Industries, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ignacio Duenas (Plaintiff); As to: Belcan Engineering Group, LLC (Defendant); PPG Industries, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ignacio Duenas (Plaintiff); As to: Belcan Engineering Group, LLC (Defendant); PPG Industries, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PPG INDUSTRIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUVAN-CLARKE BARBARA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GENISH JONATHAN MEIR

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPELLMAN ALEXANDER K.