Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/23/2020 at 12:38:19 (UTC).

IGLESIAS, RICARDO OMAR VS PALACIOS, FRANCISCA ERNESTINA

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 IGLESIAS, RICARDO OMAR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PALACIOS, FRANCISCA ERNESTINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4252

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

IGLESIAS RICARDO OMAR

Respondent

PALACIOS FRANCISCA ERNESTINA

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Default FL170

8/14/2020: Declaration - Default FL170

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

8/14/2020: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

Judgment

8/25/2020: Judgment

Notice - Entry of Judgment

8/25/2020: Notice - Entry of Judgment

Notice - Change of Address

8/6/2020: Notice - Change of Address

Request - Enter Default FL165

8/6/2020: Request - Enter Default FL165

Proof of Service of Summons

7/29/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

7/29/2020: Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

5/15/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

5/15/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Summons

5/15/2020: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

5/15/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

5/20/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

5/20/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketNotice - Change of Address; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less