Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2021 at 07:12:40 (UTC).

IDURRE ALONSO, ET AL. VS J.K.W. PROPERTIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 IDURRE ALONSO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against J K W PROPERTIES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2582

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARVAJAL BY AND THROUGH GAL JOSEBA

CARVAJAL BY AND THROUGH GAL MIKEL

CARVAJAL BY AND THROUGH GAL JOSE

ALONSO IDURRE

Defendants

LINDA L. MURRAY LIVING TRUST

MURRAY LINDA L.

J.K.W. PROPERTIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VIRAG BRIAN J.

VIRAG BRIAN JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

4/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

4/12/2021: PI General Order

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MIKEL

4/19/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MIKEL

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JOSEBA

5/4/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JOSEBA

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/1/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2024
  • Hearing03/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • Hearing09/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • Hearing09/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Joseba); Filed by IDURRE ALONSO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Mikel); Filed by IDURRE ALONSO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by IDURRE ALONSO (Plaintiff); Joseba Carvajal, by and through GAL (Plaintiff); Mikel Carvajal, by and through GAL (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by IDURRE ALONSO (Plaintiff); Joseba Carvajal, by and through GAL (Plaintiff); Mikel Carvajal, by and through GAL (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JKW PROPERTIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIRAG BRIAN