This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 01:37:12 (UTC).

IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY VS JEANIE LOUISE

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle case was filed by IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY against JEANIE LOUISE in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3091

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

MARC D. GROSS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant and Respondent

TARON JEANIE LOUISE

 

Court Documents

ORDER TAKING MOTIONS TO COMPEL OFF CALENDAR

6/7/2018: ORDER TAKING MOTIONS TO COMPEL OFF CALENDAR

PETITIONER IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE)

6/18/2018: PETITIONER IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE)

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PETITIONER/RESPONDENT IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY TO COMPEL RESPONDENT/CLAIMANT JEANIE LOUISE TARON TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO PETITIONER'S DEMAND FOR P

6/18/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PETITIONER/RESPONDENT IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY TO COMPEL RESPONDENT/CLAIMANT JEANIE LOUISE TARON TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO PETITIONER'S DEMAND FOR P

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PETITIONER/RESPONDENT IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY TO COMPEL RESPONDENT/CLAIMANT JEANIE LOUISE TARON TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO PETITIONER'S FORM INTERRO

6/18/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PETITIONER/RESPONDENT IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY TO COMPEL RESPONDENT/CLAIMANT JEANIE LOUISE TARON TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO PETITIONER'S FORM INTERRO

PETITIONER IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE)

6/18/2018: PETITIONER IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE)

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

10/31/2018: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Order

11/28/2018: Order

Notice of Ruling

12/14/2018: Notice of Ruling

Motion to Compel Discovery

1/28/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery

Notice of Ruling

3/6/2019: Notice of Ruling

Motion for Sanctions

4/4/2019: Motion for Sanctions

Minute Order

5/23/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/14/2018: Minute Order

Motion to Compel

5/16/2018: Motion to Compel

PETITIONER IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE)

4/19/2018: PETITIONER IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE)

AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PETITIONER IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY TO COMPEL CLAIMANT JEANIE LOUISE TARON TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO PETITIONER?S DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF D

4/19/2018: AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PETITIONER IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY TO COMPEL CLAIMANT JEANIE LOUISE TARON TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO PETITIONER?S DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF D

PETITIONER 1DS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE)

4/19/2018: PETITIONER 1DS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE)

PETITION TO OPEN ACTION

4/4/2018: PETITION TO OPEN ACTION

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Sanctions - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Order (Granting Motion for Terminating Sanctions); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Separate Statement; Filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Motion for Sanctions; Filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2018
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PETITIONER IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY TO COMPEL CLAIMANT JEANIE LOUISE TARON TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO PETITIONER'S FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT O

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PETITIONER IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY TO COMPEL CLAIMANT JEANIE LOUISE TARON TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO PETITIONER S DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE); REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Motion to Compel; Filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Motion to Compel; Filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • NOTICE OF PETITIONER IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO COMPEL ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • PETITION TO OPEN ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • NOTICE OF PETITIONER IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO COMPEL ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BS173091    Hearing Date: December 17, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INS. CO.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

JEANIE LOUISE TARON,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BS173091

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

December 17, 2019

1. Background Facts

IDS and Taron were involved in an uninsured motorists’ arbitration proceeding. Because the parties had been unable to resolve discovery disputes, this petition was filed in Superior Court. IDS scheduled an IDC for 10/31/18, but Taron failed to appear. On 11/28/18, the Court granted IDS’s unopposed motion to compel further responses to discovery.

Additionally, on 2/28/19, the Court heard and granted IDS’s unopposed motions to compel Taron to respond to special interrogatories (set two) and RPDs (set three).

The Court imposed monetary sanctions on both 11/28/18 and 2/28/19.

On 5/23/19, the Court granted IDS’s unopposed motion for terminating sanctions based on Taron’s continued failure to comply with the prior orders for discovery.

2. Motion to Vacate Dismissal

At this time, Taron moves to vacate the dismissal, contending the dismissal was entered as the result of a calendaring error in Taron’s attorney’s office. Taron moves pursuant to CCP §§473(b) and 473(d). IDS opposes the motion. Any reply to the opposition was due on or before 12/10/19; Taron has not filed a reply to the opposition.

To the extent the motion is based on §473(b), it is denied due to Taron’s failure to provide a copy of proper responses with the moving papers. §473(b) requires the moving party to provide a copy of the responsive pleading that cures the prior deficiency with the moving papers. Notably, the discovery at issue has been pending for a very long time, such that terminating sanctions were not imposed due to a mere “calendaring error,” but instead due to an ongoing pattern and practice of failing to comply with discovery obligations.

To the extent the motion is based on §473(d), it is also denied. Taron fails entirely to show how the order at issue is “void.”

The motion is denied. Taron is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.