This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 05:06:08 (UTC).

IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE CO VS CAMERON TAYLOR

Case Summary

On 09/05/2017 IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE CO filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CAMERON TAYLOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4824

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

TAYLOR CAMERON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MENDELSON LEE M.

SCHWARZ MARC A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. SUBROGATION CLAIM 2. INDEBTEDNESS

9/5/2017: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. SUBROGATION CLAIM 2. INDEBTEDNESS

SUMMONS

9/5/2017: SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

9/18/2017: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/05/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Non-Service); Filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. SUBROGATION CLAIM 2. INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****4824    Hearing Date: November 04, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL

On September 5, 2017, plaintiff IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against defendant Cameron Taylor (“Defendant”) for subrogation relating to an automobile insurance policy in effect on May 4, 2016. Plaintiff served Defendant on January 30, 2019. A non-jury trial was scheduled for March 5, 2019 but Plaintiff’s attorney failed to appear, and the Court dismissed the case.

“The court may, upon any terms as may be just, relieve a party or his or her legal representative from a judgment, dismissal, order, or other proceeding taken against him or her through his or her mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or excusable neglect.” (Code Civ. Proc., ; 473, subd. (b).) Application for this relief shall be made within a reasonable time, in no case exceeding six months, after judgment, dismissal, order, or proceeding was taken. (Ibid.) “[T]he court shall, whenever an application for relief is made no more than six months after entry of judgment, is in proper form, and is accompanied by an attorney’s sworn affidavit attesting to his or her mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or neglect, vacate any (1) resulting default entered by the clerk against his or her client, and which will result in entry of a default judgment, or (2) resulting default judgment or dismissal entered against his or her client, unless the court finds that the default or dismissal was not in fact caused by the attorney’s mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or neglect.” (Ibid.)

Plaintiff’s counsel submits a declaration explaining that his failure to appear at trial was due to a calendaring error. However, Plaintiff did not file a proof of service showing service of the motion on Defendant. Accordingly, the Motion to set aside the March 5, 2019 dismissal is DENIED without prejudice.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MENDELSON LEE MICHAEL