This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/19/2023 at 05:09:07 (UTC).

IDA DUARTE, AN INDIVIDUAL VS ANKRUM FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTERSHIP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 IDA DUARTE, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against ANKRUM FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTERSHIP,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9157

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUARTE AN INDIVIDUAL IDA

Defendants

CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ANKRUM FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTERSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GODOY ERIC H.

Defendant Attorney

DEMASON MICHELLE R.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/20/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/8/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Answer

4/28/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/9/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/2/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

10/21/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Request for Dismissal

1/27/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/30/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/30/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/30/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by IDA DUARTE, AN INDIVIDUAL on 05/20/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by IDA DUARTE, AN INDIVIDUAL as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: IDA DUARTE, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: ANKRUM FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTERSHIP (Defendant); CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Signed and Filed by: IDA DUARTE, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: ANKRUM FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTERSHIP (Defendant); CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 11/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 10/03/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 10/18/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: ANKRUM FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTERSHIP (Defendant); CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant); As to: IDA DUARTE, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: IDA DUARTE, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: ANKRUM FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTERSHIP (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/03/2022; Service Cost: 124.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: IDA DUARTE, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: ANKRUM FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTERSHIP (Defendant); CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: IDA DUARTE, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: ANKRUM FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTERSHIP (Defendant); CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: IDA DUARTE, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: ANKRUM FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTERSHIP (Defendant); CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less