This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2021 at 00:59:28 (UTC).

ICKA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS CKCC, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/21/2019 ICKA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CKCC, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9547

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ICKA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ICKA INC.

Defendants

TRAN HUONG

YOON STEVE

CKCC INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA NISSI TRIM

BEE INVESTMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

NGUYEN THUONG

CKCC INC. DBA NISSI TRIM

BEE INVESTMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHOI JOHN HYONGJO

CHOI JOHN H.

PAK J.P.

Defendant Attorneys

LIM SHI YOUNG

LIM S. YOUNG

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO SUBMIT DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS...)

5/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO SUBMIT DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO SUBMIT DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS...)

11/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO SUBMIT DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: E...)

8/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: E...)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/9/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

4/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

Substitution of Attorney

3/20/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/20/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/24/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

1/27/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/4/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/11/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Answer

10/18/2019: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/7/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/7/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/7/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/4/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/21/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/21/2019: Complaint

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Order to Show Cause Re: (failure to submit default judgment as to defendantsCKCC, Inc., a California corporation dba Nissi Trim; Thuong Nguyen, an individual and Huong Tran, an individual) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: failure to submit default judgment as...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Order to Show Cause Re: (failure to submit default judgment as to defendantsCKCC, Inc., a California corporation dba Nissi Trim; Thuong Nguyen, an individual and Huong Tran, an individual) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: failure to submit default judgment as...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 78; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 78; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Order to Show Cause Re: E...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by J.P. PAK (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ICKA, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ICKA, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ICKA, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ICKA, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ICKA, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ICKA, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ICKA, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ICKA, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEE INVESTMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIM S. YOUNG

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIM SHI YOUNG