This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 05:44:59 (UTC).

IBRAHIM, SYED ROSHAN VS TASNEEM, FNU SYEDA SHAISTHA

Case Summary

On 01/30/2017 IBRAHIM, SYED ROSHAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TASNEEM, FNU SYEDA SHAISTHA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHORT, MICHELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4388

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SHORT, MICHELLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

IBRAHIM SYED ROSHAN

Respondent

TASNEEM FNU SYEDA SHAISTHA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2017
  • at 8:30 AM in Department F48, Short, Michelle, Presiding; Default Prove Up Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure ((WAIVED) - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ibrahim, Syed ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Request - Default Setting (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ibrahim, Syed - Hearing Set on 2017-06-28 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- Submitted to DEPT F48 - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ibrahim, Syed ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ibrahim, Syed ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ibrahim, Syed ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 02-16-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Declaration (Sep Prop - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ibrahim, Syed ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Declaration (Com Prop - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ibrahim, Syed ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F48 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ibrahim, Syed ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ibrahim, Syed ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Statement - Financial (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ibrahim, Syed ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.