This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/05/2022 at 10:58:01 (UTC).

IBRAHIM, OSAMA VS ISKANDAR, HEIDY ZAKARYA

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 IBRAHIM, OSAMA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ISKANDAR, HEIDY ZAKARYA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SANTOS, M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0252

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SANTOS, M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

IBRAHIM OSAMA

Respondent

ISKANDAR HEIDY ZAKARYA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ALKAM THOMAS

Respondent Attorneys

GONZALEZ MANUEL ELI

KAZEMI MICHAEL M

 

Court Documents

Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

10/20/2021: Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

RFO/MTN - Compel

8/20/2021: RFO/MTN - Compel

Declaration - Default FL170

11/16/2021: Declaration - Default FL170

Notice - Entry of Judgment

12/9/2021: Notice - Entry of Judgment

Judgment

12/9/2021: Judgment

Minute Order

12/2/2021: Minute Order

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

10/20/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

10/20/2021: Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

Notice - Rejection - judgment package rec. 10/20/2021

11/8/2021: Notice - Rejection - judgment package rec. 10/20/2021

Request - Continue Hearing - sent Dept 123

9/17/2021: Request - Continue Hearing - sent Dept 123

Declaration-Notice on Request-Temp Emergency Orders FL-303

9/17/2021: Declaration-Notice on Request-Temp Emergency Orders FL-303

Order - on Respondent's Request to Rescheduled 9/23/2021 hearing.

9/21/2021: Order - on Respondent's Request to Rescheduled 9/23/2021 hearing.

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

7/26/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

8/20/2021: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • Docketat 8:45 AM in Department 123, Santos, M., Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAppearance, Stipulations and Waivers; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - Stipulated (Rejected ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAZEMI MICHAEL M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GONZALEZ MANUEL ELI