This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2022 at 16:10:00 (UTC).

IBRAHIM KARAS, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST FOR SAMIRA KARAS VS LOS ALAMITOS MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 IBRAHIM KARAS, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST FOR SAMIRA KARAS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOS ALAMITOS MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD L. FRUIN, THOMAS D. LONG and AUDRA MORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4066

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD L. FRUIN

THOMAS D. LONG

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KARAS INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST FOR SAMIRA KARAS IBRAHIM

IBRAHIM KARAS AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

KARAS IBRAHIM

Defendants

LOS ALAMITOS MEDICAL CENTER

BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL

THE REHABILITATION CENTER ON LA BREA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS STEVEN D.

Defendant Attorneys

PETERSEN JASON J.

GRASS JEFFERY W

COLLINS COOPER W

HEALEY JEFFREY S.

COLLINS COOPER W.

GRASS JEFFERY W.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT THE REHABILITATION CENTER ON LA BREA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

10/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT THE REHABILITATION CENTER ON LA BREA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT RE: DEFENDANT LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

10/25/2021: Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT RE: DEFENDANT LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALT SUMMARY ADJUDIC...)

10/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALT SUMMARY ADJUDIC...)

Order - ORDER ORDER RE: DEFENDANT LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

10/25/2021: Order - ORDER ORDER RE: DEFENDANT LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Notice of Ruling

10/27/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

10/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JUDITH CLIMENSON, RN, CCRN-CMC, CNRN- SCRN

11/16/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JUDITH CLIMENSON, RN, CCRN-CMC, CNRN- SCRN

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID KAPLOWITZ, M.D.

11/16/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID KAPLOWITZ, M.D.

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF ELECTRONIC MEDIA

11/16/2021: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF ELECTRONIC MEDIA

Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

11/16/2021: Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

11/16/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Notice - NOTICE EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORINTHEALTERNATIVESUMMARY ADJUDICATION

11/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORINTHEALTERNATIVESUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DIANE M. DALY

11/16/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DIANE M. DALY

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION BY DEFENDANT BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL

11/23/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION BY DEFENDANT BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY BARLOW RESPIRATORY ...)

11/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY BARLOW RESPIRATORY ...)

Request for Dismissal

9/22/2021: Request for Dismissal

Order - ORDER ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

9/15/2021: Order - ORDER ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Request for Dismissal

7/28/2021: Request for Dismissal

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • Hearing02/07/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 15 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • Hearing01/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 15 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (by Barlow Respiratory Hospital [174668209925]*--) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment by Barlow Respiratory ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION BY DEFENDANT BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL); Filed by Barlow Respiratory Hospital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lodging (of Electronic Media); Filed by Ibrahim Karas (Plaintiff); Ibrahim Karas, as successor in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of David Kaplowitz, M.D.); Filed by Ibrahim Karas (Plaintiff); Ibrahim Karas, as successor in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketOpposition (PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION); Filed by Ibrahim Karas (Plaintiff); Ibrahim Karas, as successor in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF DIANE M. DALY); Filed by Ibrahim Karas (Plaintiff); Ibrahim Karas, as successor in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF JUDITH CLIMENSON, RN, CCRN-CMC, CNRN- SCRN); Filed by Ibrahim Karas (Plaintiff); Ibrahim Karas, as successor in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Barlow Respiratory Hospital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by Barlow Respiratory Hospital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ibrahim Karas (Plaintiff); Ibrahim Karas, as successor in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ibrahim Karas (Plaintiff); Ibrahim Karas, as successor in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ibrahim Karas (Plaintiff); Ibrahim Karas, as successor in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ibrahim Karas (Plaintiff); Ibrahim Karas, as successor in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint (For Damages); Filed by Ibrahim Karas (Plaintiff); Ibrahim Karas, as successor in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ibrahim Karas (Plaintiff); Ibrahim Karas, as successor in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******4066    Hearing Date: January 12, 2021    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

IBRAHIM KARAS ;

Plaintiff,

v.

LOS ALAMITOS MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.,

Defendants.

Case No.: *******4066

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

INITIAL NOTE: This is not a tentative ruling. It is being posted with the tentative rulings to give Counsel notice not to appear. This is a final order and the case is being transferred.

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 31 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE CENTRAL DISTRICT, JUDGE RICHARD FRUIN presiding in DEPT. 15 of the STANLEY MOSK Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.

COUNSEL ARE TO NOTE THAT EVEN IF THE CASE SUMMARY STILLS SHOWS DEPARTMENT 31 WITH FUTURE HEARINGS, COUNSEL ARE TO CONSIDER THEM TO BE OFF CALENDAR UNTIL THE NEW COURT SAYS OTHERWISE.

DATED: January 12, 2021 ___________________________

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REHABILITATION CENTER ON LA BREA THE is a litigant

Latest cases where Dr. Karas is a litigant

Latest cases where BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where LOS ALAMITOS MEDICAL CENTER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant