This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2021 at 01:51:48 (UTC).

IBARRA, LUCAS VS IBARRA, BLANCA SILVIA

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 IBARRA, LUCAS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against IBARRA, BLANCA SILVIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9528

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

IBARRA LUCAS

Respondent

IBARRA BLANCA SILVIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JONES AYINDE

Respondent Attorney

ZITNEY JONATHON ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Notice - Case Assignment

8/19/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

8/19/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Summons

8/19/2021: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

8/19/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

8/19/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

8/19/2021: Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

8/19/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

9/21/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Proof of Service - Mail - Response to Dissolution of Marriage

9/14/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - Response to Dissolution of Marriage

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

9/14/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Declaration - Income and Expense

11/9/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Response to Dissolution of Marriage ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONES AYINDE A