Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2021 at 06:43:50 (UTC).

IAN ZACHARY BOTNICK, ET AL. VS BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 IAN ZACHARY BOTNICK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1519

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JONES MARY

BOTNICK IAN ZACHARY

BOTNICK CANDY MICHELLE

Defendant

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BARMASSE JASON M

Other Attorneys

DAGHIGHIAN SEPEHR

 

Court Documents

Answer

11/30/2020: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

12/2/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

12/2/2020: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AGAI...) OF 12/03/2020

12/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AGAI...) OF 12/03/2020

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

12/3/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AGAI...)

12/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AGAI...)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

12/3/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Proof of Personal Service

11/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/10/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/29/2020: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 3:42 PM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Defendant BMW of North America, LLC Peremptory Challenge Agai...) of 12/03/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Defendant BMW of North America, LLC Peremptory Challenge Agai...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by BMW of North America LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by BMW of North America LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Stay of Proceedings); Filed by BMW of North America LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BMW of North America LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ian Zachary Botnick (Plaintiff); Candy Michelle Botnick (Plaintiff); Mary Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ian Zachary Botnick (Plaintiff); Candy Michelle Botnick (Plaintiff); Mary Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ian Zachary Botnick (Plaintiff); Candy Michelle Botnick (Plaintiff); Mary Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ian Zachary Botnick (Plaintiff); Candy Michelle Botnick (Plaintiff); Mary Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant