Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/18/2020 at 00:40:55 (UTC).

HYPERMEDIA SYSTEMS, INC. VS PAUL MCDANIEL

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 HYPERMEDIA SYSTEMS, INC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against PAUL MCDANIEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9388

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HYPERMEDIA SYSTEMS INC.

Defendant

MCDANIEL PAUL AKA EDWARD MARTIN KARUKU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POWELL STEWART

 

Court Documents

Judgment

12/12/2019: Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 12/12/2019

12/12/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 12/12/2019

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL FRICK IN SUPPORT OF REQUST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

10/4/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL FRICK IN SUPPORT OF REQUST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

Brief - BRIEF SUMMARY OF THE CASE

10/4/2019: Brief - BRIEF SUMMARY OF THE CASE

Request for Dismissal

10/4/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/4/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEWART J. POWELL IN SUPPORT OF REQUST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

10/4/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEWART J. POWELL IN SUPPORT OF REQUST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 09/23/2019

9/23/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 09/23/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

9/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

6/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/21/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/21/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/4/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/4/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/19/2019: Complaint

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of default judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment) of 12/12/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Hypermedia Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Hypermedia Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Michael Frick in Support of Requst for Court Judgment); Filed by Hypermedia Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketBrief (Summary of the Case); Filed by Hypermedia Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Hypermedia Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Stewart J. Powell in Support of Requst for Court Judgment); Filed by Hypermedia Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of default judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Hypermedia Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Hypermedia Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Hypermedia Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hypermedia Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Hypermedia Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hypermedia Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hypermedia Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HYPERMEDIA SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POWELL STEWART