This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2023 at 11:48:18 (UTC).

HYOJIN LEE, AN INDIVIDUAL VS THE RITZ-CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2023 HYOJIN LEE, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THE RITZ-CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE W. MANDEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0189

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE W. MANDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEE AN INDIVIDUAL HYOJIN

Defendants

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

ROLFS AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN

THE RITZ-CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COX HEATHER KATHLEEN

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/18/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/18/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/18/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/18/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

1/18/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/18/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/19/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/19/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

1/20/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/20/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION PENDING BINDING AR...) OF 03/08/2023

3/8/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION PENDING BINDING AR...) OF 03/08/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION PENDING BINDING AR...)

3/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION PENDING BINDING AR...)

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND TO STAY MATTER PENDING ARBITRATION

3/8/2023: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND TO STAY MATTER PENDING ARBITRATION

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2023
  • Hearing09/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Arbitration scheduled for 09/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Joint Stipulation to Submit Matter to Binding Arbitration and to Stay Matter Pending Arbitration: Status Date changed from 03/08/2023 to 03/08/2023 ; Exact Name: Joint Stipulation to Submit Matter to Binding Arbitration and to Stay Matter Pending Arbitration ; Result Date changed from 03/08/2023 to 03/08/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Hyojin Lee, an individual (Plaintiff) to Hyojin Lee, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Stipulation to Stay Action Pending Binding Ar...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Stipulation to Stay Action Pending Binding Ar...) of 03/08/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order Joint Stipulation to Submit Matter to Binding Arbitration and to Stay Matter Pending Arbitration; Signed and Filed by: THE RITZ-CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); As to: Hyojin Lee, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation to Submit Matter to Binding Arbitration and to Stay Matter Pending Arbitration: Filed By: MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant),THE RITZ-CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 03/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Binding Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 03/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 03/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Hyojin Lee, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: THE RITZ-CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); John Rolfs, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Hyojin Lee, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: THE RITZ-CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); John Rolfs, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Hyojin Lee, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: THE RITZ-CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); John Rolfs, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine W. Mandel in Department P Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less