This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2021 at 02:33:02 (UTC).

HYO KIM, ET AL. VS HAITAO GROUP LLC

Case Summary

On 07/29/2020 HYO KIM filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HAITAO GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8604

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KIM HYO

KIM INGYU

Defendant

HAITAO GROUP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SZABO LAWRENCE JAY

Defendant Attorney

MARYANSKI DONNA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/29/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/29/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/29/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

8/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/26/2020: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/26/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

11/12/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Case Management Statement

10/28/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/26/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/12/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • Hearing03/08/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • Hearing12/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Hyo Kim (Plaintiff); Ingyu Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Haitao Group LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Hyo Kim (Plaintiff); Ingyu Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Haitao Group LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Hyo Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Hyo Kim (Plaintiff); Ingyu Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Hyo Kim (Plaintiff); Ingyu Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hyo Kim (Plaintiff); Ingyu Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hyo Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less