This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2019 at 00:56:17 (UTC).

HYG FINANCIAL SERVICES INC VS ISLAND PACIFIC PITTSBURG INC

Case Summary

On 06/21/2018 HYG FINANCIAL SERVICES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ISLAND PACIFIC PITTSBURG INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0394

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HYG FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

Defendants

ISLAND PACIFIC PITTSBURG INC

NINO LIM JEFFERSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASSAYAG MICHELE S.

Defendant Attorney

HAVKIN STELLA ANNE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/20/2018: Request for Dismissal

Notice

11/13/2018: Notice

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

7/23/2018: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice (of stay of proceedings); Filed by Lim Jefferson Nino (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by HYG FINANCIAL SERVICES INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Order to Show Cause Re

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by HYG FINANCIAL SERVICES INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HYG Financial Services, Inc., D/B/A NMHG Financial Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAVKIN STELLA A. ESQ.