Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/03/2018 at 06:12:10 (UTC).

HYE YEONG PARK VS L'ATELIER STUDIO INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 HYE YEONG PARK filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against L'ATELIER STUDIO INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5791

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PARK HYE YEONG

Defendants and Respondents

KIM OLIVIA

L'ATELIER STUDIO INC

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MOON & YANG APC

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MC ATTORNEY GROUP SARA CHON

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/19/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

1/23/2018: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. WAGE AND HOUR VIOLATIONS - FAILURE TO PAY WAGES AND OVERTIME COMPENSATION ; ETC

3/29/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. WAGE AND HOUR VIOLATIONS - FAILURE TO PAY WAGES AND OVERTIME COMPENSATION ; ETC

SUMMONS

3/29/2017: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/13/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/13/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/3/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/8/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. WAGE AND HOUR VIOLATIONS - FAILURE TO PAY WAGES AND OVERTIME COMPENSATION; ETC

5/12/2017: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. WAGE AND HOUR VIOLATIONS - FAILURE TO PAY WAGES AND OVERTIME COMPENSATION; ETC

DEFENDANTS L'ATELIER STUDIO, INC. AND OLIVIA KIM'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF HYE YEONG PARK'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

6/14/2017: DEFENDANTS L'ATELIER STUDIO, INC. AND OLIVIA KIM'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF HYE YEONG PARK'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Unknown

6/19/2017: Unknown

Unknown

6/28/2017: Unknown

Unknown

7/7/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

7/10/2017: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

7/10/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

8/29/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Status Conference (RE WHETHER TO ORDER MSC) - Case Dismissed/Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Trial Date Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Order-Case Management; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less