This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2022 at 18:44:43 (UTC).

HUTCHINSON, MEGAN CATHLEEN VS HUTCHINSON, NICHOLAS ADAM

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 HUTCHINSON, MEGAN CATHLEEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HUTCHINSON, NICHOLAS ADAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARDSON, ANNE K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1768

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARDSON, ANNE K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HUTCHINSON MEGAN CATHLEEN

Respondent

HUTCHINSON NICHOLAS ADAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

LEVINE CHRISTIANA DANIELLE

LEVINE KENZIE

Respondent Attorney

COHAN SABRINA S

 

Court Documents

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

10/14/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

Notice - Case Assignment

10/12/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

10/12/2021: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

10/12/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Declaration - Income and Expense

10/12/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support - Re: Attorney's Fees

10/12/2021: RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support - Re: Attorney's Fees

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

3/16/2022: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

Stipulation and Order - Re Child Custody, Visitation, Spousal Support and Child Support

2/3/2022: Stipulation and Order - Re Child Custody, Visitation, Spousal Support and Child Support

Minute Order

2/3/2022: Minute Order

Proposed - Stipulation and Order - Proposed - Stipulation and Order - for child support, spousal support and custody and visitation

2/2/2022: Proposed - Stipulation and Order - Proposed - Stipulation and Order - for child support, spousal support and custody and visitation

Responsive Declaration - Responsive Declaration to RFO for Support and Custody

1/21/2022: Responsive Declaration - Responsive Declaration to RFO for Support and Custody

Declaration - Income and Expense - Declaration - Income and Expense

1/21/2022: Declaration - Income and Expense - Declaration - Income and Expense

FCS - Agreement

1/18/2022: FCS - Agreement

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

12/27/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

12/27/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

12/27/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

Mail - Certificate of Mailing

12/8/2021: Mail - Certificate of Mailing

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2022
  • Hearing09/13/2022 at 8:30 AM in Department 43 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure (Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketNon-Sufficient Funds Returned Check

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 43, Richardson, Anne K., Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Off Calendar - Per Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Re Child Custody, Visitation, Spousal Support and Child Support ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketResponsive Declaration (Responsive Declaration to RFO for Support and Custody ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense (Declaration - Income and Expense ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support (Re: Attorney's Fees ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOrder - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHAN SABRINA S