This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 00:04:38 (UTC).

HUSSAM YACOUB VS ASSET SENTRY ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/25/2017 HUSSAM YACOUB filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ASSET SENTRY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT L. HESS and MARC MARMARO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3689

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT L. HESS

MARC MARMARO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

YACOUB HUSSAM

BARAKAT NIDAL

HUSSAM YACOUB

Respondents, Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ALL AMERICAN TRADITIONS FOUNDATION REPAIR

KELLER WILLIAMS BEACH CITIES

A-1 CONCRETE & CONSTRUCTION INC.

BLUE CENTURION HOMES LLC

ASSET SENTRY

BEACH CITIES RE INC.

FAECHER TAMMY SHAWLEY

REMAX SIGNATURE SERVICES

MITCHELL PHILLIP

DMBR & ASSOCIATES INC.

KLEIN DEBRA

O'NEIL DEBBIE

D'AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY INC.

KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES REALTY

ALL AMER. TRADITIONS FOUND. REPAIR INC.

O'NEIL DEBBIE AKA DEBRA KLEIN AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

A-1 CONCRETE & CONSTRUCTION INC.

O'NEIL DEBBIE AKA DEBRA KLEIN AN INDIVIDUAL

BLUE CENTURION HOMES LLC

ASSET SENTRY

FAECHER TAMMY SHAWLEY

MITCHELL PHILLIP

ALL AMERICAN TRADITIONS INC. MOE 2

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GHOLIAN ARTIN

HAFFNER JOSHUA H. ESQ.

HAFFNER LAW PC

JORDAN LAW GROUP APLC

HAFFNER JOSHUA H

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GLICKFELD FIELDS & JACOBSON LLP

HARBIN & MCCARRON APC

KENNEDY & SOUZA

MANNING & KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ TRESTER LLP

FIELDS CRAIG MICHAEL

BAKER SHEILA ARLENE

BRECHT NATHAN PAUL

KENNEDY KEVIN PETER

ERLICH RINAT B

LOANGKOTE LINNA T.

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SANDLER ERIKA LYN

MCCARRON ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/12/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

1/16/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND RULING RE: DEMURRERS AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE BY DEFENDANTS ASSET SENTRY AND BLUE CENTURION AND D'AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC. AND TAMMY SHAWLEY FAECHER

1/16/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND RULING RE: DEMURRERS AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE BY DEFENDANTS ASSET SENTRY AND BLUE CENTURION AND D'AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY, INC. AND TAMMY SHAWLEY FAECHER

Unknown

1/4/2018: Unknown

Unknown

12/27/2017: Unknown

Unknown

1/2/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF RINAT KLIER-ERLICH IN SUPPORT [C.C.P. ?430.41]

10/24/2017: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF RINAT KLIER-ERLICH IN SUPPORT [C.C.P. ?430.41]

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT

10/24/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT

A-1 CONCRETE & CONSTRUCTION, INC.?S JELD-WEN V. SUPERIOR COURT OBJECTION

10/31/2017: A-1 CONCRETE & CONSTRUCTION, INC.?S JELD-WEN V. SUPERIOR COURT OBJECTION

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

10/18/2017: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT; ETC.

10/20/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT; ETC.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT

10/5/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/21/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/25/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/15/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/15/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/15/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS

8/25/2017: SUMMONS

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Asset Sentry (Defendant); Blue Centurion Homes, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Objection (Asset Sentry and Blue Centurion); Filed by Asset Sentry (Cross-Defendant); Blue Centurion Homes, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Opposition (TO MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF DMBR & ASSOCIATES, INC. dba RE/MAX SIGNATURE SERVICES AND DEBBIE O'NEIL aka DEBRA KLEIN; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF); Filed by Asset Sentry (Cross-Defendant); Blue Centurion Homes, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Objection (TO EVIDENCE AND MOTION TO STRIKE TESTIMONY OF ERIKA L. SANDLER AND ARTIN GHOLIAN IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF A-1 CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION, INC. AND PHILLIP M); Filed by Asset Sentry (Defendant); Blue Centurion Homes, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Motion to Challenge the Good Faith of a Settlement (CCP 877.6); Filed by Asset Sentry (Defendant); Blue Centurion Homes, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Motion for Leave to Amend (to file 2nd Amended Complaint); Filed by Nidal Barakat (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by A-1 Concrete & Construction, Inc. (Defendant); Phillip Mitchell (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Declaration (in Support of Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement); Filed by Nidal Barakat (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Declaration ( in Support of Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement); Filed by A-1 Concrete & Construction, Inc. (Defendant); Phillip Mitchell (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Filed by A-1 Concrete & Construction, Inc. (Defendant); Phillip Mitchell (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
228 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by YACOUB HUSSAM (Plaintiff); Nidal Barakat (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR PREEMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION BY PLAINTIFF; DECLARATION OF JOSHUA H. HAFFNER IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Receipt-Depository; Filed by YACOUB HUSSAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE (CONSTRUCTION DEFECT); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Summons; Filed by YACOUB HUSSAM (Plaintiff); Nidal Barakat (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by YACOUB HUSSAM (Plaintiff); Nidal Barakat (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Reply/Response; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEACH CITIES RE INC. DBA KELLER WILLIAMS BEACH CITIES is a litigant

Latest cases where D'AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY INC. DBA KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES is a litigant