Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/20/2020 at 00:23:06 (UTC).

HURBERT MADISON DEAN VS HURBERT MAX DEAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 HURBERT MADISON DEAN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HURBERT MAX DEAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4848

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEAN HURBERT MADISON

Defendants

NOMINAL DEFENDANT MORTGAGEIT INC A CORPORATION

DEAN MONDENE

DEAN HURBERT MAX

MORTGAGEIT INC. A CORPORATION A NOMINAL DEFENDANT

MORTGAGEIT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GRAJEWSKI WAYNE S

GRAJEWSKI WAYNE S.

Defendant Attorneys

MCALPIN KAHLIL JEROME

MCALPIN KAHLIL J.

ALKANA EUGENE S.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;)

1/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;)

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

1/23/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/10/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

10/3/2019: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;) OF 09/24/2019

9/24/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;) OF 09/24/2019

Notice of Related Case

9/9/2019: Notice of Related Case

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

8/30/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration - DECLARATION EXHIBITS 1 - 9 TO THE DECLARATION OF WAYNE S. GRAJEWSKI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING

8/30/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION EXHIBITS 1 - 9 TO THE DECLARATION OF WAYNE S. GRAJEWSKI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING

Declaration - DECLARATION OF WAYNE S. GRAJEWSKI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES AND FOR SANCTIONS

7/29/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF WAYNE S. GRAJEWSKI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES AND FOR SANCTIONS

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

7/29/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Exhibit List

7/29/2019: Exhibit List

Proof of Personal Service

6/28/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer - ANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER BY DEF HURBERRT MAX DEAN AND MONDENE DEAN TO COMPLAINT

5/31/2019: Answer - ANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER BY DEF HURBERRT MAX DEAN AND MONDENE DEAN TO COMPLAINT

Order - ORDER COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING ON DEMURRER

5/9/2019: Order - ORDER COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING ON DEMURRER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

5/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

Notice of Ruling

5/10/2019: Notice of Ruling

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

4/26/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/12/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2020
  • Hearing04/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF COURT'S ORDER IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT); Filed by Hurbert Madison Dean (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:54 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Hurbert Madison Dean (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: notice of settlement;) of 01/17/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: notice of settlement;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (to consolidate, or, in the alternative, stay or abate a related case) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Hurbert Madison Dean (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Hurbert Madison Dean (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Hurbert Madison Dean (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Hurbert Madison Dean (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Hurbert Madison Dean (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hurbert Madison Dean (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Hurbert Madison Dean (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hurbert Madison Dean (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORTGAGEIT INC. A NEW YORK CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRAJEWSKI WAYNE S