This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 18:59:25 (UTC).

HUNDRED HARMONIES ASSN OF FAITH ET AL VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY

Case Summary

On 03/06/2018 HUNDRED HARMONIES ASSN OF FAITH filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6369

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HUNDRED HARMONIES ASSOCIATION OF FAITH

ASSOCIATION OF SACRAMENTAL MINISTRIES

THE ASSOCIATION OF SACRAMENTAL MINISTRIES INC.

LUU CINDI

LV KRK LLC

PHAN JAMES Y.

FRASER BRENT D.

PAPPAS MATTHEW S.

REEVES ALANNA

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

LOS ANGELES COUNTY

DOES 1 TO 10

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

CINDRICH MICHAEL

PAPPAS MATTHEW

CINDRICH MICHAEL EDWARD

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

STEEL SARI JANICE

Cross Defendant Attorneys

BYNUM LAWRENCE

PAPPAS MATTHEW SCOTT

CURIALE ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Initial Status Conference Order

7/16/2018: Initial Status Conference Order

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

9/5/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

Initial Status Conference Order

5/28/2019: Initial Status Conference Order

Opposition - OPPOSITION CROSS-COMPLAINANT THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA AND DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT'S HUNDRED HARMONIES ASSOC

9/13/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION CROSS-COMPLAINANT THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA AND DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT'S HUNDRED HARMONIES ASSOC

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SARI J. STEEL IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA AND DEFENDANT/ CROSS-COMPLAINANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF/CROSS-

9/13/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SARI J. STEEL IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA AND DEFENDANT/ CROSS-COMPLAINANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF/CROSS-

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION)

10/2/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION)

Notice of Ruling

10/9/2019: Notice of Ruling

Order - ORDER ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF/ CROSS-DEFENDANT HUNDRED HARMONIES ASSOCIATION OF FAITH'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND IMPOSING SANCTIONS

10/23/2019: Order - ORDER ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF/ CROSS-DEFENDANT HUNDRED HARMONIES ASSOCIATION OF FAITH'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND IMPOSING SANCTIONS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEPUTY JAIME MORAN IN SUPPORT

11/27/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEPUTY JAIME MORAN IN SUPPORT

Motion for Preliminary Injunction

11/27/2019: Motion for Preliminary Injunction

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

11/27/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PARALEGAL LAURA SALAZAR IN SUPPORT

11/27/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PARALEGAL LAURA SALAZAR IN SUPPORT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DETECTIVE CHARLES WARREN IN SUPPORT

11/27/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DETECTIVE CHARLES WARREN IN SUPPORT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DETECTIVE JOSE NANQUIL IN SUPPORT

11/27/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DETECTIVE JOSE NANQUIL IN SUPPORT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DETECTIVE ROBERT SPRINGER IN SUPPORT

11/27/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DETECTIVE ROBERT SPRINGER IN SUPPORT

Request for Judicial Notice

11/27/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAMES CRAIG ECKART (SBN 192078) IN SUPPORT

11/27/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAMES CRAIG ECKART (SBN 192078) IN SUPPORT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERGEANT JOHN S. BONES IN SUPPORT

11/27/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERGEANT JOHN S. BONES IN SUPPORT

151 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • Hearing07/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Post-Mediation Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
218 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Sent to Pappas, Matthew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Hundred Harmonies Association of Faith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF; INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; AND DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by The Association of Sacramental Ministries Inc. (Plaintiff); Hundred Harmonies Association of Faith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed by Hundred Harmonies Association of Faith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC696369    Hearing Date: May 26, 2021    Dept: 55

HUNDRED HARMONIES ASSN. v. L.A. COUNTY

Hearing Date:  5/26/21,  Dept. 55

#10:  MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER.

Notice:  Okay

No Opposition

MP:  Defendant/Cross-Complainants THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA and  COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES.

RP:  

Summary

On 3/6/18, plaintiffs ASSOCIATION OF SACRAMENTAL MINISTRIES, and HUNDRED HARMONIES ASSOCIATION OF FAITH, filed a Complaint for declaratory relief; injunctive relief; and damages, alleging that, after being provided with the church certificates of ordination, sheriff deputies broke down the temple door, arrested members, and seized sacramental cannabis.

On 4/12/18, Defendants THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, AND COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Cross-Complaint against Plaintiff, and others, to abate violations of the Los Angeles County Code, and enjoin unlawful business practices and for injunctive, monetary, and other equitable relief.

MP Positions

Moving party requests an order granting judgment on the pleadings as to each claim in the Complaint of Plaintiff, ASSOCIATION OF SACRAMENTAL MINISTRIES, A NON-PROFIT UNINCORPORATED RELIGIOUS ASSOCIATION.

Additionally, the People move to strike the Answer to the People’s Cross-Complaint.

The motion is made on bases including the following:  

Association of Sacramental Ministries, a non-profit unincorporated religious association, ceased to exist upon its incorporation as The Association of Sacramental Ministries, Inc., a non-profit public benefit corporation, January 26, 2018. The corporate status of The Association of Sacramental Ministries, Inc. ceased to exist upon its filing a short form dissolution on September 4, 2018. As such, both entities lack capacity to prosecute or defend the action that is the subject of this motion.

Neither Association of Sacramental Ministries nor The Association of Sacramental Ministries, Inc., have standing to maintain or defend the action….

(Motion, p. 2.)

Tentative Ruling

The unopposed motion is granted, as prayed.

The failure to file a proper and timely opposition in trial court creates a waiver of the issues on any appeal.  Bell v. Am. Title Ins. Co. (1991) 226 Cal. App. 3d 1589, 1602;  Cabrini Villas Homeowners Assn. v. Haghverdian (2003) 111 Cal. App. 4th 
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEEL SARI JANICE