This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/14/2022 at 15:51:44 (UTC).

HUMISTON, JOSH - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 HUMISTON, JOSH - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GARCIA, RUBEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2102

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GARCIA, RUBEN

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MEISELAS BEN

HUMISTON ROBERT

Not Classified By Court

CHARLES CHELSEA

GUTIERREZ RUBEN

Decedent

HUMISTON JOSH

Other

AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorneys

MEISELAS BENJAMIN JARED

EICK WILLIAM EUGENE

Other Attorney

KRASILOVSKY SETH WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Letters (Initial)

11/18/2022: Letters (Initial)

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

11/15/2022: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

11/15/2022: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Minute Order

11/2/2022: Minute Order

Will - Admitted

11/2/2022: Will - Admitted

Minute Order

11/2/2022: Minute Order

Waiver - (No Fee) - of Notice

10/27/2022: Waiver - (No Fee) - of Notice

Supplement - First Supplement to Petition

10/27/2022: Supplement - First Supplement to Petition

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

10/10/2022: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Reply - Reply to Objections to Petitioner's Supplement to Clear Probate Notes

9/29/2022: Reply - Reply to Objections to Petitioner's Supplement to Clear Probate Notes

Notice - Notice of Errata (Comment)

9/30/2022: Notice - Notice of Errata (Comment)

Will Deposited - 8 Pgs - Dated 12/10/2012

10/3/2022: Will Deposited - 8 Pgs - Dated 12/10/2012

Minute Order

10/4/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

10/5/2022: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication

9/8/2022: Proof of Publication

Petition - Probate of Will (Subsequent)

9/22/2022: Petition - Probate of Will (Subsequent)

Supplement - Supplement to Clear Probate Notes

9/26/2022: Supplement - Supplement to Clear Probate Notes

Objection - Subsequent Petition Decedent's Estate

9/29/2022: Objection - Subsequent Petition Decedent's Estate

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2024
  • Hearing04/10/2024 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 9 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Decedent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 9, Garcia, Ruben, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 9, Garcia, Ruben, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketPetition Denied (Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial) filed on March 4, 2022 by Ben Meiselas. )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketWill (Admitted )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document (Verification to Agency for the Performing Arts, Inc.'s Objections (Comment) ); Filed by Objector

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Objector

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketObjection - Appointment of Personal Representative (to Petition for Letters and Creditor's Claim ); Filed by Objector

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Decedent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AGENCY FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRASILOVSKY SETH WILLIAM