This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 01:56:21 (UTC).

HUMBERTO CONTRERAS VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/24/2017 HUMBERTO CONTRERAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3742

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

CONTRERAS HUMBERTO

Respondents and Defendants

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

NORTH EPP TERRY

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

THE DOMINGUEZ FIRM INC.

TAILLIEU OLIVIER ALAIN

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

BECKS HAROLD G. ESQ.

BECKS HAROLD GLEN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND DEPP TERRY NORTH'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF PERSONNEL RECORDS

8/27/2018: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND DEPP TERRY NORTH'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF PERSONNEL RECORDS

DECLARATION OF LIEUTENANT MATTHEW OHNEMUS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PERSONNEL RECORDS

8/27/2018: DECLARATION OF LIEUTENANT MATTHEW OHNEMUS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PERSONNEL RECORDS

DECLARATION OF V. RENE DALEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PERSONNEL RECORDS

8/27/2018: DECLARATION OF V. RENE DALEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PERSONNEL RECORDS

NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND DEPP TERRY NORTHS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF PERSONAL RECORDS

8/29/2018: NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND DEPP TERRY NORTHS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF PERSONAL RECORDS

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

8/30/2018: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

Minute Order

9/10/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/27/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

1/7/2019: Case Management Statement

Unknown

1/7/2019: Unknown

Case Management Statement

1/8/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Order

1/11/2019: Case Management Order

Minute Order

1/11/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

1/28/2019: Unknown

Unknown

1/30/2019: Unknown

Notice

2/20/2019: Notice

Unknown

3/12/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

3/13/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/4/2019: Minute Order

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Status Conference (re whether to order MSC) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re whether to order MSC)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference; Filed by Los Angeles, County of (Defendant); EPP Terry North (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Informal Discovery Conference); Filed by Humberto Contreras (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference; Filed by Humberto Contreras (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Los Angeles, County of (Defendant); EPP Terry North (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Humberto Contreras (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND EPP TERRY NORTH TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Los Angeles, County of (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Humberto Contreras (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Humberto Contreras (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****3742    Hearing Date: February 04, 2020    Dept: 50

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

humberto contreras,

Plaintiff,

vs.

county of los angeles, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

BC 673742

Hearing Date:

February 4, 2020

Hearing Time:

8:30 a.m.

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE:

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Jennifer R. Bagosy of the Dominguez Firm (“Counsel”) moves to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff Humberto Contreras. The Court finds that Counsel has complied with the relevant procedural requirements (CRC 3.1362) and has provided sufficient reason for withdrawal. Accordingly, the Court grants the motion.

Counsel is ordered to give notice of this order.

DATED: February 4, 2020 ________________________________

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAILLIEU OLIVIER A. ESQ.