This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2022 at 15:50:43 (UTC).

HUGO SALCEDO VS VERITIV OPERATING COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 HUGO SALCEDO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VERITIV OPERATING COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9010

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALCEDO HUGO

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

VERITIV OPERATING COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Cross Defendants

PDQ PLASTICS INC.

XPO LOGISTICS CARTAGE LLC

XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REED MUAMMAR

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HATEM ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

7/6/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/22/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Personal Service

6/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE

6/23/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE

Cross-Complaint

5/23/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

5/23/2022: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

3/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

3/14/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/14/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/14/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/14/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/14/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

3/14/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2025
  • Hearing03/10/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2023
  • Hearing09/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • Hearing08/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketNotice (of entry of order); Filed by VERITIV OPERATING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Order Extending Time to Serve) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Order Extending Time to Serve); Filed by VERITIV OPERATING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by VERITIV OPERATING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by VERITIV OPERATING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by VERITIV OPERATING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by VERITIV OPERATING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by HUGO SALCEDO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by HUGO SALCEDO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by HUGO SALCEDO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XPO LOGISTICS CARTAGE LLC DBA XPO LOGISTICS is a litigant

Latest cases where XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Veritiv Operating Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HATEM ROBERT JOSEPH