This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/08/2023 at 12:49:45 (UTC).

HUGO FAJARDO MENDEZ VS OMER MAOR

Case Summary

On 03/13/2023 HUGO FAJARDO MENDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OMER MAOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1112

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MENDEZ HUGO FAJARDO

Defendant

MAOR OMER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PIRNIA ARDY

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/13/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/13/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/13/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/13/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/14/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/30/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2023
  • Hearing07/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: HUGO FAJARDO MENDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: OMER MAOR (Defendant); Service Cost: 137.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Huey P. Cotton in Department A Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: HUGO FAJARDO MENDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: OMER MAOR (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: HUGO FAJARDO MENDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: OMER MAOR (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: HUGO FAJARDO MENDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: OMER MAOR (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less