This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2023 at 21:59:20 (UTC).

HUGO FAJARDO MENDEZ VS OMER MAOR

Case Summary

On 03/13/2023 HUGO FAJARDO MENDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OMER MAOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1112

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MENDEZ HUGO FAJARDO

Defendant

MAOR OMER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PIRNIA ARDY

Defendant Attorney

BRISCOE J. JACKSON

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/13/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/13/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/13/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons Summons on Complaint

3/13/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/14/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/30/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

5/4/2023: Answer

Case Management Statement

7/11/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/11/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

7/25/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/8/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/29/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

8/29/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/29/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

9/14/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2024
  • Hearing09/09/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2024
  • Hearing08/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 09/09/2024 at 09:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A updated: Result Date to 09/14/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: HUGO FAJARDO MENDEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: OMER MAOR (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: OMER MAOR (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 09/01/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: OMER MAOR (Defendant); As to: HUGO FAJARDO MENDEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: HUGO FAJARDO MENDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: OMER MAOR (Defendant); Service Cost: 137.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Huey P. Cotton in Department A Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: HUGO FAJARDO MENDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: OMER MAOR (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: HUGO FAJARDO MENDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: OMER MAOR (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: HUGO FAJARDO MENDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: OMER MAOR (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less