This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2020 at 03:12:01 (UTC).

HUGO BALTAZAR ALFARO VS LA COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/08/2018 HUGO BALTAZAR ALFARO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LA COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9270

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ALFARO HUGO BALTAZAR

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 10

LA COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AU-

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LA LEGAL OFFICES

SHAGHZO ARMEN

SHAGHZO ARMEN ESQ.

BRABECK PAUL RICHARD ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

NEBENZAHL MICHAEL R. ESQ.

NEBENZAHL MICHAEL RALPH ESQ.

NEBENZAHL MICHAEL R.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE RE RESULT OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

7/16/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE RE RESULT OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Notice of Settlement

7/16/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

7/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Substitution of Attorney

4/20/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER VACATING THE 04/20/2020 FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, ...) OF 03/30/2020

3/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER VACATING THE 04/20/2020 FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, ...) OF 03/30/2020

Notice of Ruling

12/31/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES; DECLARATION OF MONICA DE LEON IN SUPPORT OF THEREOF

11/4/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES; DECLARATION OF MONICA DE LEON IN SUPPORT OF THEREOF

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/25/2019

11/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/25/2019

Response - RESPONSE RESPONSE PLAINTIFF HUGO ALFARO STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION BY DEFENDANT LACMTA FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE MAY 4 2019

12/2/2019: Response - RESPONSE RESPONSE PLAINTIFF HUGO ALFARO STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION BY DEFENDANT LACMTA FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE MAY 4 2019

Notice - NOTICE TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANT LACMTA'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

12/4/2019: Notice - NOTICE TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANT LACMTA'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR HUGO ALFARO

8/14/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR HUGO ALFARO

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/14/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

9/14/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM AND ADDRESS

9/14/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM AND ADDRESS

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

3/28/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUMMONS -

1/8/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

1/8/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • Hearing12/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Hugo Baltazar Alfaro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice Re Result Of Trial Setting Conference); Filed by LA County Metropolitan Transportation Au- (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by LA County Metropolitan Transportation Au- (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docketat 11:41 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by LA County Metropolitan Transportation Au- (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM AND ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LA County Metropolitan Transportation Au- (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Hugo Baltazar Alfaro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hugo Baltazar Alfaro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC689270    Hearing Date: December 13, 2019    Dept: 2

Alfaro v. LA County Metropolitan Transportation

Motion to Continue Trial/ Defendant's Motion to Continue Trial and All Related Dates is GRANTED.

Good cause having been shown, the Court continues the FSC and the trial to the following dates: 

FSC: April 20, 2020

Trial: May 4, 2020 at 8:30 a.m.

The discovery and motion cut off dates are to be calculated based on the new trial date.

Moving party is ordered to give notice. 

Case Number: BC689270    Hearing Date: December 05, 2019    Dept: 2

BC689270 Alfaro v. Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authorization

On the court’s own motion, the hearing on the Motion to Continue Trial set for 12/5/19 is continued to 12/13/19 at 1:30 p.m. in Department SS-2. The due dates for the opposition and reply are based on the original hearing date.