This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2022 at 20:44:16 (UTC).

HUGO ALBERTO AGUILAR, ET AL. VS JESUSA M. CORONEL

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 HUGO ALBERTO AGUILAR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JESUSA M CORONEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9618

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AGUILAR HUGO ALBERTO

AGUILAR MIRIAM LISETTE

Defendant

CORONEL JESUSA M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALIAV ALON M. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

WOOLSEY MIGOYA KELLY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/24/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/18/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

6/15/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

6/15/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/8/2021: PI General Order

Notice - NOTICE OF STAY OF ACTION

9/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF STAY OF ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2024
  • Hearing05/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • Hearing11/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • Hearing11/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Stay of Action); Filed by JESUSA M. CORONEL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by HUGO ALBERTO AGUILAR (Plaintiff); MIRIAM LISETTE AGUILAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by JESUSA M. CORONEL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JESUSA M. CORONEL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by HUGO ALBERTO AGUILAR (Plaintiff); MIRIAM LISETTE AGUILAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by HUGO ALBERTO AGUILAR (Plaintiff); MIRIAM LISETTE AGUILAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by HUGO ALBERTO AGUILAR (Plaintiff); MIRIAM LISETTE AGUILAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIGOYA KELLY WOOLSEY ESQ.