This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 22:08:59 (UTC).

HUBERT GOMEZ VS STEVE DE MARCOS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 HUBERT GOMEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STEVE DE MARCOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2744

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOMEZ HUBERT

Defendants

AMERICAN VISION WINDOWS INC.

DE MARCOS STEVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOGOYAN JACK

Defendant Attorney

VIEIRA LORI L.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/3/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO REMOVE PRAYER FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES AS TO AMERICAN VISION WINDOWS, INC.

11/3/2021: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO REMOVE PRAYER FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES AS TO AMERICAN VISION WINDOWS, INC.

Answer

10/29/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/29/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS PURSUIT OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, PROPOSED ORDER FILED SEPARATELY

10/29/2021: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS PURSUIT OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, PROPOSED ORDER FILED SEPARATELY

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2024
  • Hearing08/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • Hearing03/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • Hearing02/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket[Proposed] Order Approving Stipulation To Remove Prayer For Punitive Damages As To American Vision Windows, Inc.; Filed by American Vision Windows, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by American Vision Windows, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketStipulation To Dismiss Plaintiffs Pursuit Of Punitive Damages, Without Prejudice, proposed order filed separately; Filed by American Vision Windows, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by American Vision Windows, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Hubert Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hubert Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hubert Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN VISION WINDOWS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOGOYAN JACK