This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2022 at 04:56:10 (UTC).

HUAWEI LIU, LILI QU VS ABF FREIGHT SYSTEM, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 HUAWEI LIU, LILI QU filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against ABF FREIGHT SYSTEM, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL E. WHITAKER and AUDRA MORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4728

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUAWEI LIU LILI QU

Defendants

PLAYER JOHNNY JR.

ABF FREIGHT SYSTEM INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUNBAR DANIEL W.

Defendant Attorneys

STROMBERG TRACEY L

FOX DANA A.

 

Court Documents

Answer

10/27/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/24/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

9/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) OF 09/28/2022

9/28/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) OF 09/28/2022

Notice of Change of Firm Name

2/25/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/5/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Motion to Continue - MOTION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT, ABF FREIGHT SYSTEM, INC. 'S, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED MOTION AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND A

8/19/2022: Motion to Continue - MOTION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT, ABF FREIGHT SYSTEM, INC. 'S, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED MOTION AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND A

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL W. DUNBAR IN OPPOSITIONRESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ABF FREIGHT SYSTEM, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED MOTION AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES

8/25/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL W. DUNBAR IN OPPOSITIONRESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ABF FREIGHT SYSTEM, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED MOTION AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED MOTION AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES

8/25/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED MOTION AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED...)

8/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT ABF FREIGHT SYSTEM, INC.S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED MOTION AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES

8/29/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT ABF FREIGHT SYSTEM, INC.S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED MOTION AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES

Notice of Ruling

8/29/2022: Notice of Ruling

Answer

5/24/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/24/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/6/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

4/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2024
  • Hearing04/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • Hearing07/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2023
  • Hearing06/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: JOHNNY PLAYER, Jr. (Defendant); As to: HUAWEI LIU, LILI QU (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: HUAWEI LIU, LILI QU (Plaintiff); As to: JOHNNY PLAYER, Jr. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/17/2022; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Continue Trial scheduled for 09/28/2022 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 09/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Continue DEFENDANT, ABF FREIGHT SYSTEM, INC. 'S, MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED MOTION AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF TRACEY L. STROMBERG; [PROPOSED] ORDER: Filed By: ABF FREIGHT SYSTEM, INC. (Defendant); Result: Off Calendar; Result Date: 09/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial) of 09/28/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: ABF FREIGHT SYSTEM, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: HUAWEI LIU, LILI QU (Plaintiff); As to: ABF FREIGHT SYSTEM, INC. (Defendant); Service Date: 04/23/2021; Service Cost: 171.56; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 04/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: HUAWEI LIU, LILI QU (Plaintiff); As to: ABF FREIGHT SYSTEM, INC. (Defendant); JOHNNY PLAYER, Jr. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: HUAWEI LIU, LILI QU (Plaintiff); As to: ABF FREIGHT SYSTEM, INC. (Defendant); JOHNNY PLAYER, Jr. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: HUAWEI LIU, LILI QU (Plaintiff); As to: ABF FREIGHT SYSTEM, INC. (Defendant); JOHNNY PLAYER, Jr. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABF FREIGHT SYSTEMS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNBAR DANIEL