Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2020 at 08:50:48 (UTC).

HUAN NGUY VS GARDA CL WEST, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 HUAN NGUY filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GARDA CL WEST, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE, SAMANTHA JESSNER and MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5168

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

SAMANTHA JESSNER

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NGUY HUAN

Defendant

GARDA CL WEST INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DIBA KASEY

ALAVI AMIR TAHER

Defendant Attorneys

HEINICKE MALCOLM A.

LEE JOSEPH D.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/28/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

2/10/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Case Management Statement

1/22/2020: Case Management Statement

Answer

12/19/2019: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/20/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/08/2019

11/8/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/08/2019

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

11/8/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

10/29/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 10/29/2019

10/29/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 10/29/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER- NOTICE OF TIME CHANGE RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER- NOTICE OF TIME CHANGE RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CLASS CLAIMS AND REPRESENTATIVE CLAIMS AND REPRESENTATIVE CLAIMS UNDER THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT

10/18/2019: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CLASS CLAIMS AND REPRESENTATIVE CLAIMS AND REPRESENTATIVE CLAIMS UNDER THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT

Notice of Appearance

9/26/2019: Notice of Appearance

Proof of Personal Service

9/9/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER (COMPLEX LITIGATION)

8/20/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER (COMPLEX LITIGATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE) OF 08/12/2019, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

8/12/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE) OF 08/12/2019, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Initial Status Conference Order

8/12/2019: Initial Status Conference Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/19/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Huan Nguy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Huan Nguy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketNotice ( of Trial and Related Dates); Filed by Huan Nguy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Huan Nguy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Garda CL West, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketNotice ( of Case Management Conference); Filed by Huan Nguy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Garda CL West, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Huan Nguy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Initial Status Conference and Order (Complex Litigation)); Filed by Huan Nguy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case) of 08/12/2019, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Huan Nguy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Huan Nguy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARDA CL WEST INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALAVI AMIR TAHER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIBA KASEY