This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 00:40:48 (UTC).

HSI CHE WANG VS MARY MEI LI FONG ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/07/2018 a Property - Other Real Property case was filed by HSI CHE WANG against MARY MEI LI FONG in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5315

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

WANG HSI CHE

WANG JAMES

Respondents and Defendants

FONG MARY MEI LI

LIU CONNIE CHING HUEI

DOES 1 TO 10

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/16/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

EX PARTE APPLICATION ON COMPLAINT FOR: BREACH OF CONTRACT, QUIET TITLE, PARTITION, UNJUST ENRICHMENT, ACCOUNTING & APPRAISAL, FOR A TRO AND; ETC.

5/18/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION ON COMPLAINT FOR: BREACH OF CONTRACT, QUIET TITLE, PARTITION, UNJUST ENRICHMENT, ACCOUNTING & APPRAISAL, FOR A TRO AND; ETC.

Minute Order

5/18/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TRO AND OSC RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ENJOINING ANY RENTAL OF UNIT A AND ALL UNITS UNTIL LITIGATION HAS BEEN DETERMINED

5/18/2018: NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TRO AND OSC RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ENJOINING ANY RENTAL OF UNIT A AND ALL UNITS UNTIL LITIGATION HAS BEEN DETERMINED

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

7/16/2018: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

7/16/2018: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

Minute Order

7/20/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANTS MARY MEL LI FONG AND CONNIE CHING HUEI LIU; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF SA'ID VAKILI IN SUPPORT THEREOF

8/27/2018: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANTS MARY MEL LI FONG AND CONNIE CHING HUEI LIU; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF SA'ID VAKILI IN SUPPORT THEREOF

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

9/4/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Complaint

11/20/2018: Complaint

Case Management Statement

1/17/2019: Case Management Statement

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

1/30/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Cross-Complaint

4/18/2019: Cross-Complaint

Substitution of Attorney

5/6/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Notice

6/28/2019: Notice

Notice

6/28/2019: Notice

SUMMONS

5/7/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

5/7/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • Notice (Amended Notice of Motion to Compel Further Responses & Request for Monetary Sanctions); Filed by Mary Mei Li Fong (Defendant); Connie Ching Huei Liu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Notice (Amended Notice of Motion to Compel Further Responses, Document Production & Request for Monetary Sanctions); Filed by Mary Mei Li Fong (Defendant); Connie Ching Huei Liu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Hsi Che Wang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Hsi Che Wang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY & EXCUSE FROM ANY MOTIONS TO COMPEL) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (Withdrawal of Attorney & Excuse from any Motions to Compel); Filed by Hsi Che Wang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on Ex...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Notice of Motion (NOTICE OF DEFENDANT/CROSS COMPLAINANT MARY MElLI FONG'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO HER FIRST PRODUCTION DEMAND TO); Filed by Mary Mei Li Fong (Defendant); Connie Ching Huei Liu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Notice of Motion (NOTICE OF DEFENDANT/CROSS COMPLAINANT MARY MElLI FONG'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO HER FIRST SET OF FORM INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT HSI CHE WANG A/KIA JAMES WANG,); Filed by Mary Mei Li Fong (Defendant); Connie Ching Huei Liu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-05-18 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Hsi Che Wang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC705315    Hearing Date: November 08, 2019    Dept: 74

BC705315 HSI CHE WANG VS MARY MEI LI FONG ET AL

Defendant/cross-complainant Mary Mei Li Fong’s (1) Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories and for Sanctions and (2) Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production and for Sanctions

TENTATIVE RULING: The motions to compel further responses are GRANTED. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified, code compliant responses within 20 days and to produce all responsive documents within 30 days. To the extent plaintiff claims a privilege or asserts a right to privacy over any of the responsive documents or information, plaintiff shall simultaneously serve a privilege log with the document production that, at a minimum, identifies each document for which a privilege or privacy right is claimed, its author, recipients, date of preparation, and the specific privilege or privacy right claimed. Former counsel Betty M. Kwan is to pay defendant Mary Mei Li Fong sanctions of $6520 within 30 days.