This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2021 at 01:26:45 (UTC).

HOWARD WEINBROT, AN INDIVIDUAL VS ERIC C. HU, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/27/2019 HOWARD WEINBROT, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ERIC C HU, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6831

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEINBROT AN INDIVIDUAL HOWARD

Defendants

HU AN INDIVIDUAL ERIC C.

PREMIER PLASTIC SURGERY A CALIFORNIA BUSINESS FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMON DAWN T.

 

Court Documents

Order - Dismissal

5/28/2021: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT)

5/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...) OF 02/26/2021

2/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...) OF 02/26/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...)

2/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/27/2020

7/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/27/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 08/12/2020

8/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 08/12/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

8/12/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/27/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint

2/27/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/27/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/27/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

3/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

Other - - Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

3/4/2019: Other - - Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (For failure to Obtain a Default) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to File Proof of Service) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof o...) of 02/26/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof o...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by HOWARD WEINBROT, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by HOWARD WEINBROT, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) of 08/12/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docketat 2:59 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/27/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketStanding Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by HOWARD WEINBROT, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by HOWARD WEINBROT, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by HOWARD WEINBROT, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMON DAWN T.