This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 03:56:51 (UTC).

HOWARD, LESLIE LAWRENCE - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 11/02/2017 HOWARD, LESLIE LAWRENCE - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L., WADA, ROBERT S and PENNY, BRENDA J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9905

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.

WADA, ROBERT S

PENNY, BRENDA J.

 

Party Details

Others and Petitioners

MOORE DAVID G.

HENKE STEPHAN

DOCTORS WITHOUT BORDERS MSF USA

COONEY JANINE

WHITTIER AREA FIRST DAY COALITION

CURTIS DELAYN

ONE ARCHIVE

LAMBERT KATHLEEN COONEY

AMERICAN FRIENDS SERVICE COMMITTEE

SCHWORER BYRA ESTATE OF

BREEZ JUDY

HOMEBOY INDUSTRIES

NEUMAN KAREN COONEY

MAYKOWSKI KEITH JR

WHITTIER COLLEGE

HEAGNEY MICHELLE

CROOKS JAMES ANTHONY

AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION ACLU

BAILEY VIRGINIA

Decedent

HOWARD LESLIE LAWRENCE

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STEWART CHARISE LYNETTE

 

Court Documents

Petition - Probate of Will (Initial) - ORIGINAL WILL (5 pgs) Submitted 11/27/17

11/2/2017: Petition - Probate of Will (Initial) - ORIGINAL WILL (5 pgs) Submitted 11/27/17

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

11/8/2017: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication

12/1/2017: Proof of Publication

Will - Admitted

12/4/2017: Will - Admitted

Minute Order

12/4/2017: Minute Order

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

12/7/2017: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Order - Order for Probate

12/13/2017: Order - Order for Probate

Letters (Initial)

12/28/2017: Letters (Initial)

Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee - Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

1/3/2018: Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee - Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

Notice - Administration to Creditors - Notice to File or Present Claim

1/8/2018: Notice - Administration to Creditors - Notice to File or Present Claim

Consent - Consent to Representation

6/22/2018: Consent - Consent to Representation

Substitution of Attorney

6/22/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Consent - Consent to Sale of Real Property (Whittier)

7/3/2018: Consent - Consent to Sale of Real Property (Whittier)

Minute Order

9/14/2018: Minute Order

Inventory & Appraisal - Final

9/20/2018: Inventory & Appraisal - Final

Status Report of Personal Representative - Status Report of Executor

12/28/2018: Status Report of Personal Representative - Status Report of Executor

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

1/2/2019: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Minute Order

1/11/2019: Minute Order

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketOrder

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Docketin Probate Department 99, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Status Report Hearing - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketPetition Granted (Status Report of Personal Representative filed on December 28, 2018 by David G. Moore. )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketEstate Administration Extended

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing - Amended ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Docketin Probate Department 99, Wada, Robert S, Presiding; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketStatus Report of Personal Representative (Status Report of Executor ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Docketin Probate Department 99, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketWill (Admitted )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Initial) (ORIGINAL WILL (5 pgs) Submitted 11/27/17 ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less