This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/19/2023 at 15:53:26 (UTC).

HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION, ET AL. VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/21/2022 HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION, filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9662

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

APARTMENT ASSOCIATION OF GREATER LOS ANGELES

HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

NEWCASTLE COURTYARDS LLC

Defendant

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Interested Parties

SHAMA ENTERPRISES LLC

KOREAN IMMIGRANT WORKERS ADVOCATES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 2015

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION OF NON-PROFIT HOUSING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DOUGHERTY LAURA ELIZABETH

COSTELL JEFFREY LEE

Defendant Attorneys

SIEGEL KEVIN D.

WHITLEY DANIEL

BURKE TAMAR M.

CASTELLA J. LEAH

OLLIVIER EILEEN

Interested Party Attorneys

SEEMEN BART ALAN

MILLER NICOLE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER TO BACK-DATE DEF...)

3/16/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER TO BACK-DATE DEF...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER TO BACK-DATE DEF...) OF 03/16/2023

3/16/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER TO BACK-DATE DEF...) OF 03/16/2023

Answer

2/16/2023: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

3/10/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 03/10/2023

3/10/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 03/10/2023

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER DEEMING FILING DATE OF DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO BE FEBRUARY 15

3/9/2023: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER DEEMING FILING DATE OF DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO BE FEBRUARY 15

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

3/8/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

3/7/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Status Conference Statement

3/3/2023: Status Conference Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/3/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ORDER DEEMING THE FILING DATE OF DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO BE FEBRUARY 15

3/3/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ORDER DEEMING THE FILING DATE OF DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO BE FEBRUARY 15

Status Conference Statement

3/3/2023: Status Conference Statement

Notice of Related Case

3/3/2023: Notice of Related Case

Status Conference Statement

3/3/2023: Status Conference Statement

Association of Attorney

2/28/2023: Association of Attorney

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER DEEMING FILING DATE OF DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO BE FEBRUARY 15

2/17/2023: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER DEEMING FILING DATE OF DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO BE FEBRUARY 15

Answer

2/16/2023: Answer

Answer

2/15/2023: Answer

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • Hearing05/03/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Answer: Filed By: All Persons Interested (Defendant); Result: Stricken ; Result Date: 03/16/2023 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Order Deeming Filing Date of Defendants' Answer To Be February 15; Declaration of Nicole Miller in Support Thereof: Filed By: All Persons Interested (Defendant); Result: Denied ; Result Date: 03/16/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketAnswer of Southern California Association of Non-Profit Housing, Inc., Korean Immigrant Workers Advocates of Southern California DBA Koreatown Immigrant Workers Alliance and Service Employees International Union Local 2015 to Plaintiffs' Complaint; Filed by: Southern California Association of Non-Profit Housing, Inc. (Real Party in Interest); Korean Immigrant Workers Advocates of Southern California (Real Party in Interest); Service Employees International Union Local 2015 (Real Party in Interest)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Answer of Southern California Association of Non-Profit Housing, Inc., Korean Immigrant Workers Advocates of Southern California DBA Koreatown Immigrant Workers Alliance and Service Employees International Union Local 2015 to Plaintiffs' Complaint: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order to Back-Date Def...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order to Back-Date Def...) of 03/16/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order to Back-Date Defendants All Persons Interested Timely Filed Answer scheduled for 03/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 updated: Result Date to 03/16/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference Re: Notice of Related Case)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Status Conference Re: Notice of Related Case) of 03/10/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2022
  • Docket** Case Name changed from APARTMENT ASSOCIATION OF GREATER LOS ANGELES, et al. vs ALL PERSONS INTERESTED, et al. to HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION, et al. vs CITY OF LOS ANGELES, et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Apartment Association of Greater Los Angeles (Plaintiff); Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Curtis A. Kin in Department 72 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Apartment Association of Greater Los Angeles (Plaintiff); Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association (Plaintiff); As to: All Persons Interested (Defendant); City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Apartment Association of Greater Los Angeles (Plaintiff); Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association (Plaintiff); As to: All Persons Interested (Defendant); City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Apartment Association of Greater Los Angeles (Plaintiff); Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association (Plaintiff); As to: All Persons Interested (Defendant); City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less