Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 04:25:33 (UTC).

HOWARD HACK VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 HOWARD HACK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER and LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2829

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HACK HOWARD

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RING BART I.

Defendant Attorney

HUESTON JOHN C.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE ST...)

6/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE ST...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND STAY DISCOVERY; ORDER...)

3/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND STAY DISCOVERY; ORDER...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

3/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND STAY DISCOVERY; HEARI...)

3/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND STAY DISCOVERY; HEARI...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFER...)

2/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFER...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

2/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Answer

1/14/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: TWENTYSECOND PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

12/31/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: TWENTYSECOND PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF TWENTYSECOND PETITION FOR COORDINATION

12/3/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF TWENTYSECOND PETITION FOR COORDINATION

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • Hearing07/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • Hearing07/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: why the stay on discovery as to Edison Defendants should not terminate on September 1, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (why the stay on discovery as to Edison Defendants should not terminate on September 1, 2021.) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: why the st...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference (Re Participating in MSC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference Re Participating in MSC)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Hearing - Other (Objection to Add-On Petition #26) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF ORDER RE: TWENTYSECOND PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES); Filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF SUBMISSION OF TWENTYSECOND PETITION FOR COORDINATION); Filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Howard Hack (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Howard Hack (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Howard Hack (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUESTON JOHN CHARLES