This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2019 at 01:44:23 (UTC).

HOWARD CONTRACTING, INC. VS ACC CONTRACTORS, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2018 HOWARD CONTRACTING, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ACC CONTRACTORS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAN THOMAS OKI. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0076

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAN THOMAS OKI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOWARD CONTRACTING INC.

Defendants

ACC CONTRACTORS INC

FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND

GLENDALE UNIFED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHONEY PAUL MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/1/2018: Complaint

Unknown

11/1/2018: Unknown

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/1/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

11/1/2018: Summons

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/7/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J, Dan Thomas Oki, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • at 00:00 AM in Department ; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J, Dan Thomas Oki, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (proof of service) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Howard Contracting, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Howard Contracting, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Howard Contracting, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACC CONTRACTORS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Howard Contracting Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where GLENDALE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND is a litigant