Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/10/2021 at 04:53:42 (UTC).

HOWAR DAVIS VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 HOWAR DAVIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5253

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVIS HOWAR

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ABM PARKING SERVICES INC.

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

ABM AVIATION GROUP INC.

LOS ANGELES WORLD AIRPORTS

ABM INDUSTRY GROUPS LLC

ABM INDUSTRY GROUP LLC

Cross Defendant

HW MAINTENANCE LAX LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARNES CARL D.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WAYNE ERIC JEFFREY

MEEHAN JOHN R

BUCHHOLZ SCOTT D.

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

12/28/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S LIST OF PARTIES (CRC RULE 3.254)

11/12/2020: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S LIST OF PARTIES (CRC RULE 3.254)

Request for Dismissal

9/18/2020: Request for Dismissal

Answer

9/16/2020: Answer

Answer

8/31/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/31/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

9/1/2020: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/2/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/2/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/2/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2023
  • Hearing06/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • Hearing12/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • Hearing12/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by ABM AVIATION, INC. Erroneously Sued As ABM Aviation Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice (Plaintiff's List of Parties (CRC Rule 3.254)); Filed by Howar Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Howar Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant); Los Angeles World Airports (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by ABM AVIATION, INC. Erroneously Sued As ABM Aviation Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ABM AVIATION, INC. Erroneously Sued As ABM Aviation Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ABM AVIATION, INC. Erroneously Sued As ABM Aviation Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Howar Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Howar Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Howar Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HW MAINTENANCE LAX LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ABM PARKING SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ABM INDUSTRY GROUPS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WAYNE ERIC JEFFREY