This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 07:41:49 (UTC).

HOVIK TOVMASYAN VS CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 HOVIK TOVMASYAN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0625

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOVMASYAN HOVIK

Defendant

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GRUN ARSINE

AMBARCHYAN VALENTINA

Defendant Attorney

CASTRONOVO TOD MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/7/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/7/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Substitution of Attorney

7/21/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

7/15/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

11/30/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/30/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

12/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/20/2021: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • Hearing01/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Hovik Tovmasyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Hovik Tovmasyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Hovik Tovmasyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Hovik Tovmasyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hovik Tovmasyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hovik Tovmasyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRUN ARSINE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMBARCHYAN VALENTINA