Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2021 at 11:00:05 (UTC).

HOVHANNISYAN, LILIA - MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 HOVHANNISYAN, LILIA - MINOR'S COMPROMISE was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0548

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HOVHANNISYAN YELENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BELORYAN HAIK ARMEN

 

Court Documents

Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited) - (Subsequent)

5/21/2021: Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited) - (Subsequent)

Proposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

5/21/2021: Proposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

5/21/2021: Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

1/6/2021: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

Rejected Proposed Order

1/6/2021: Rejected Proposed Order

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

1/6/2021: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

Rejected Proposed Order

1/6/2021: Rejected Proposed Order

Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited)

12/21/2020: Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited)

Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

12/21/2020: Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

Proposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

12/21/2020: Proposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketPetition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited) ((Subsequent) ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketProposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketProposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketPetition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELORYAN HAIK ARMEN