This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/10/2021 at 11:23:14 (UTC).

HOVHANNES GRIGORYAN VS ESPIRA PETROSYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 HOVHANNES GRIGORYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ESPIRA PETROSYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0580

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRIGORYAN HOVHANNES

Defendants

ZAKARYAN ROMAN

PETROSYAN ESPIRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOVSEPIAN NORA

Defendant Attorney

PRAGER ERIKA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/18/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

4/5/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/17/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/17/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2024
  • Hearing03/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • Hearing09/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • Hearing09/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Espira Petrosyan (Defendant); Roman Zakaryan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Espira Petrosyan (Defendant); Roman Zakaryan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Hovhannes Grigoryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hovhannes Grigoryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hovhannes Grigoryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less