Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/08/2020 at 00:39:51 (UTC).

HOSSEIN AGHAEI VS NEWCODS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 HOSSEIN AGHAEI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NEWCODS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0216

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGHAEI HOSSEIN

Defendants

NEWCODS LLC

MAKHIJANI MAHENDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIRKARIMI SASAN

Defendant Attorney

COHEN MARC

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)

7/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)

Case Management Statement

7/12/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

7/18/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

7/18/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Reply - REPLY NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

7/18/2019: Reply - REPLY NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 06/04/2019

6/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 06/04/2019

Motion to Compel Arbitration

5/9/2019: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Case Management Statement

3/29/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/29/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/2/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Personal Service

1/18/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/26/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/26/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint

11/26/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/26/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/26/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • Hearing03/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Case Management Conf...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Hossein Aghaei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Of Counsel in Support of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration); Filed by Hossein Aghaei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketReply (Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration); Filed by Hossein Aghaei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Newcods, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Hossein Aghaei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Hossein Aghaei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Hossein Aghaei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hossein Aghaei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hossein Aghaei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEWCODS LLC is a litigant