This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2023 at 04:53:17 (UTC).

HOROSHI HORIIKE VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2023 HOROSHI HORIIKE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3512

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HORIIKE HOROSHI

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOX DAVE

Defendant Attorney

HUESTON JOHN C

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

5/4/2023: Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Declaration - DECLARATION FURTHER CORRECTED AND UPDATED DECLARATION OF MARTIN E. BRENNER III IN SUPPORT OF EDISON DEFENDANTS MASTER REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR DISCOVERY NO

4/7/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION FURTHER CORRECTED AND UPDATED DECLARATION OF MARTIN E. BRENNER III IN SUPPORT OF EDISON DEFENDANTS MASTER REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR DISCOVERY NO

Reply - REPLY EDISON DEFENDANTS MASTER REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR DISCOVERY NON-COMPLIANCE

4/7/2023: Reply - REPLY EDISON DEFENDANTS MASTER REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR DISCOVERY NON-COMPLIANCE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JESSICA TEEVAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF HOROSHI HORIIKE'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

4/3/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JESSICA TEEVAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF HOROSHI HORIIKE'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Response - PLAINTIFF HOROSHI HORIIKE'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

4/3/2023: Response - PLAINTIFF HOROSHI HORIIKE'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Response - PLAINTIFF HOROSHI HORIIKE'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

4/3/2023: Response - PLAINTIFF HOROSHI HORIIKE'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

3/30/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Unknown - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

3/30/2023: Unknown - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

3/24/2023: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

3/15/2023: Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

3/13/2023: Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/13/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

3/13/2023: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Stipulation - No Order - JOINT STIPULATION FOR RELATION BACK TO ORIGINAL COMPLAINT

3/7/2023: Stipulation - No Order - JOINT STIPULATION FOR RELATION BACK TO ORIGINAL COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 03/03/2023

3/3/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 03/03/2023

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketDefendants Southern California Edison Company and Edison Internationals Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant); As to: Horoshi Horiike (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Further Corrected And Updated Declaration Of Martin E. Brenner Iii In Support Of Edison Defendants Master Reply To Plaintiffs Responses To Osc Re Dismissal For Discovery Noncompliance; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketReply Edison Defendants Master Reply To Plaintiffs Responses To Osc Re Dismissal For Discovery Non-Compliance; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff Horoshi Horiike's Response to Order to Show Cause; Filed by: Horoshi Horiike (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff Horoshi Horiike's Response to Order to Show Cause; Filed by: Horoshi Horiike (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Jessica Teevan in Support of Plaintiff Horoshi Horiike's Response to Order to Show Cause; Filed by: Horoshi Horiike (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Order Re: Petition for Coordination of Add-On Case; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant); JCCP Number: JCCP5000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 10 - Hon. William F. Highberger; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Horoshi Horiike (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Horoshi Horiike (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Horoshi Horiike (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less