*******3512
02/16/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Los Angeles, California
DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III
HORIIKE HOROSHI
EDISON INTERNATIONAL
SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY
FOX DAVE
HUESTON JOHN C
8/22/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
6/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
5/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
5/4/2023: Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT
4/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
4/7/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION FURTHER CORRECTED AND UPDATED DECLARATION OF MARTIN E. BRENNER III IN SUPPORT OF EDISON DEFENDANTS MASTER REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR DISCOVERY NO
4/7/2023: Reply - REPLY EDISON DEFENDANTS MASTER REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR DISCOVERY NON-COMPLIANCE
4/3/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JESSICA TEEVAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF HOROSHI HORIIKE'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
4/3/2023: Response - PLAINTIFF HOROSHI HORIIKE'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
4/3/2023: Response - PLAINTIFF HOROSHI HORIIKE'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
3/30/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
3/30/2023: Unknown - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE
3/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
3/24/2023: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE
3/15/2023: Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE
3/13/2023: Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE
3/13/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
3/13/2023: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE
DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)
[-] Read LessDocketOn the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for 08/21/2023 at 02:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 08/22/2023 01:30 PM
[-] Read LessDocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)
[-] Read LessDocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)
[-] Read LessDocketDefendants Southern California Edison Company and Edison Internationals Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant); As to: Horoshi Horiike (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketMinute Order (Court Order)
[-] Read LessDocketDeclaration Further Corrected And Updated Declaration Of Martin E. Brenner Iii In Support Of Edison Defendants Master Reply To Plaintiffs Responses To Osc Re Dismissal For Discovery Noncompliance; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketReply Edison Defendants Master Reply To Plaintiffs Responses To Osc Re Dismissal For Discovery Non-Compliance; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketPlaintiff Horoshi Horiike's Response to Order to Show Cause; Filed by: Horoshi Horiike (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketPlaintiff Horoshi Horiike's Response to Order to Show Cause; Filed by: Horoshi Horiike (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type
[-] Read LessDocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 10 - Hon. William F. Highberger; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: Horoshi Horiike (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Horoshi Horiike (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Horoshi Horiike (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type
[-] Read Less