This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/02/2020 at 13:12:14 (UTC).

HOPE ZARRO VS ADRIANA L ALBERGHETTI ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/16/2018 HOPE ZARRO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ADRIANA L ALBERGHETTI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8391

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ZARRO HOPE

Defendants and Respondents

THE MANAGEMENT GROUP

VINSON TRIPP

ALBERGHETTI ADRIANA L.

THE MANDEL COMPANY INC.

VINSON ADRIANA L.

VINSON DANIEL

DOES 1 TO 50

Other

HENKE ROBERT E. ESQ.

Not Classified By Court

DIAMOND DR. ELISHEVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

WALTON JOHN R. ESQ.

BALL STEPHEN CURTIS

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

HALLISY ERIN O. ESQ.

HENKE ROBERT E. ESQ.

Not Classified By Court Attorney

CALKINS DENISE MICHELE

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE JUNE 24, 2020) OF 06/16/2020

6/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE JUNE 24, 2020) OF 06/16/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

6/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MAY 06, 2020)

4/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MAY 06, 2020)

Notice of Ruling

2/28/2020: Notice of Ruling

Ex Parte Application - DEFENDANT ALBERGHETTI AND DEFENDANT VINSON'S EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

2/27/2020: Ex Parte Application - DEFENDANT ALBERGHETTI AND DEFENDANT VINSON'S EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED DATES

7/18/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED DATES

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Defendants Subpoena to the Custodi...)

2/22/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Defendants Subpoena to the Custodi...)

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

5/8/2018: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Joinder to Motion - Joinder to Motion to motion to quash

11/27/2018: Joinder to Motion - Joinder to Motion to motion to quash

Notice - Notice Notice of Errata re Plaintiff Hope Zarro's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Her Motion to Quash Defendant Adriana Alberghetti and Daniel Vinson's Subpoena to the Custodian of

12/3/2018: Notice - Notice Notice of Errata re Plaintiff Hope Zarro's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Her Motion to Quash Defendant Adriana Alberghetti and Daniel Vinson's Subpoena to the Custodian of

Motion to Quash - Motion to Quash Defendant Adriana Alberghetti and Daniel Vinson's Subpoena to Custodian of Records for Susan Ashley

11/9/2018: Motion to Quash - Motion to Quash Defendant Adriana Alberghetti and Daniel Vinson's Subpoena to Custodian of Records for Susan Ashley

Separate Statement - Separate Statement in Support of her Motion to Quash Defendant Adriana Alberghetti and Daniel Vinson's Subpoena to the Custodian of Records for Elisheva Diamond

11/9/2018: Separate Statement - Separate Statement in Support of her Motion to Quash Defendant Adriana Alberghetti and Daniel Vinson's Subpoena to the Custodian of Records for Elisheva Diamond

Separate Statement - Separate Statement In Support of Her Motion to Quash Defendant Adriana Alberghetti and Daniel Vinson's Subpoena

11/9/2018: Separate Statement - Separate Statement In Support of Her Motion to Quash Defendant Adriana Alberghetti and Daniel Vinson's Subpoena

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF MAILING ADDRESS

9/13/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF MAILING ADDRESS

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES: 1. LIABILITY OF DOG OWNER (CC 3342) 2. NEGLIGENCE/PREMISES LIABILITY

4/20/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES: 1. LIABILITY OF DOG OWNER (CC 3342) 2. NEGLIGENCE/PREMISES LIABILITY

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/1/2018: ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT

Association of Attorney -

5/14/2018: Association of Attorney -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/29/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • Hearing03/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • Hearing01/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • Hearing12/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • Docketat 1:57 PM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re June 24, 2020)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re June 24, 2020) of 06/16/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Hope Zarro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES: 1. LIABILITY OF DOG OWNER (CC 3342) 2. NEGLIGENCE/PREMISES LIABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Hope Zarro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Hope Zarro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES: 1. LIABILITY OF DOG OWNER (CC 3342) 2. NEGLIGENCEIPREMESIS LIABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hope Zarro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC698391    Hearing Date: November 08, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

HOPE ZARRO,

Plaintiff,

v.

ADRIANA L. ALBERGHETTI, et al.

Defendants.

Case No.: BC698391

Hearing Date: November 8, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

PLAINTIFF HOPE ZARRO’S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE OF SUBPOENA TO SAM’S GREEN PAW

Plaintiff Hope Zarro (“Plaintiff”) filed this action, alleging that she was attacked by Defendants’ dog at a pet hotel, Sam’s Green Paw. On July 2, 2019, Plaintiff personally served a deposition subpoena upon Sam’s Green Paw for the taking of its deposition and production of documents on July 29, 2019. The deposition occurred on July 29, 2019 with Sam Martello appearing on behalf of Sam’s Green Paw. During the deposition, Martello could not confirm whether all responsive documents had been produced. Martello also expressed his concern that Sam’s Green Paw and/or he required counsel. The parties agreed to adjourn and continue the deposition to afford Martello an opportunity to retain counsel, but Plaintiff’s counsel has been unable to reschedule the deposition. Therefore, Plaintiff filed the instant motion. However, this motion was not properly served. “A written notice and all moving papers supporting a motion to compel an answer to a deposition question or to compel production of a document or tangible thing from a nonparty deponent must be personally served on the nonparty deponent unless the nonparty deponent agrees to accept service by mail or electronic service at an address or electronic service address specified on the deposition record.” (Cal. Rules Court, rule 3.1346.) Sam’s Green Paw is not a party to this action, and Plaintiff has not complied with Rule 3.1346. Therefore, the motion is denied without prejudice.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Plaintiff’s motion is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: November 8, 2019 ___________________________

Hon. Stephen Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court